Louis Vuitton Malletier v. The Individual, Partnership, or Unincorporated Association
Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier
Defendant: The Individual, Partnership, or Unincorporated Association doing business as The Domain Names Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 0:2020cv61681
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery by Louis Vuitton Malletier. Responses due by 10/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiffs Application for Preliminary Injunction [DE 6] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2020 re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mp00)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier re #33 Supplement, #32 Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other) upon Defendant via Electronic Mail and via Website Posting (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by Louis Vuitton Malletier (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier of Identification of Additional PayPal Accounts Used by Defendant (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier of Identification of Additional Aliases (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier re #25 Notice (Other), upon Defendant via Electronic Mail and via Website Posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier re #24 Notice of Compliance upon Defendant via Electronic Mail and via Website Posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Louis Vuitton Malletier. The Individual, Partnership, or Unincorporated Association served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier re #13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #12 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #9 Order on Motion to Seal, #11 Sealed Order on Motion, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #1 Complaint, #3 Form AO 120/121, #16 Notice (Other), #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #18 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , #15 Notice (Other), #10 Sealed Document, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #19 Supplement, #8 Ex Parte Document, upon Defendant via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier re #13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #9 Order on Motion to Seal, #11 Sealed Order on Motion, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #1 Complaint, #16 Notice (Other), #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #15 Notice (Other), Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #19 Supplement, upon Defendant via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier of Identification of Additional PayPal Account Used by Defendant (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Compliance by Louis Vuitton Malletier re #11 Sealed Order on Motion, Order on Ex Parte Motion (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing Sealed Documents pursuant to #21 Order (nc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to The Individual, Partnership, or Unincorporated Association. (ail)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Seizure Bond by Louis Vuitton Malletier (amb)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Unseal. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to unseal all docket entries in this case, and return those portions of the Court file to the public records. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by Louis Vuitton Malletier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Supplemental Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Supplemental Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Louis Vuitton Malletier (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Louis Vuitton Trademarks)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier of Identification of Additional PayPal Accounts Used by Defendant (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Louis Vuitton Malletier of Identification of Additional Aliases (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Sealed Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) ; granting #7 Ex Parte Motion Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/2020. (cbr) Modified by Unsealing Document per #21 Order on 8/27/2020 (nc).
August 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/4/2020 01:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. per DE #11 (cbr) Modified on 8/24/2020 re: Date Filed. (jmd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Sealed Order; granting #6 Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/2020. (cbr) Modified by Unsealing Document per #21 Order on 8/27/2020 (nc).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 Sealed Document by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Schedule "A" to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document per #21 Order on 8/27/2020 (nc).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte Document Notice of Filing Revised Sealed Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document per #21 Order on 8/27/2020 (nc).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document per #21 Order on 8/27/2020 (nc).
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hadrien Huet in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #3 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document per #21 Order on 8/27/2020 (nc).
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louis Vuitton Malletier identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton, SE for Louis Vuitton Malletier (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (amb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13381915, filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Louis Vuitton Trademarks)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis Vuitton Malletier v. The Individual, Partnership, or Unincorporated Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individual, Partnership, or Unincorporated Association doing business as The Domain Names Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?