Randazzo v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Mary Randazzo
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61721
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Dismissing Parties. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Administratively Closing Case Pending Transfer to Multi-District Litigation. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 at 4:00 P.M. The parties are instructed to call 1-877-402-9753 by no later than 3:55 P.M. The access code is 9372453 and the password is 0918. The Court requires that the parties appear via a landline (i.e., not a cellular phone or a speaker phone) for clarity. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/24/2020. (kbm)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Ortho, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc. by Mary Randazzo (Cohen, Jonathan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Martha A. Greer, Charles Crueger, Erin Dickinson, Krista Baisch, Edward Wallace,and Michelle Perkovic, mailing date August 25, 2020, (pt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (amb) Text Modified on 8/24/2020 (amb).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13401407, filed by Mary Randazzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s))(Cohen, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randazzo v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Randazzo
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Martha A. Geer
Represented By: Krista Baisch
Represented By: Michelle Perkovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?