Dershowitz v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alan Dershowtiz
Defendant: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.
Case Number: 0:2020cv61872
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
2 Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 288 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #236 Notice (Other), OF FILING CORRECTED AND UNSEALED DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit E) (Edison, Eric)
January 31, 2023 Filing 287 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #234 Notice (Other) OF FILING CORRECTED AND UNSEALED DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 5, #2 Exhibit Ex. 6, #3 Exhibit Ex. 8, #4 Exhibit Ex. 9, #5 Exhibit Ex. 11, #6 Exhibit Ex. 13, #7 Exhibit Ex. 15, #8 Exhibit Ex. 16, #9 Exhibit Ex. 17, #10 Exhibit Ex. 20, #11 Exhibit Ex. 77, #12 Exhibit Ex. 78, #13 Exhibit Ex. 79, #14 Exhibit Ex. 80) (Edison, Eric)
January 10, 2023 Filing 286 NOTICE by Alan Dershowtiz OF FILING REDACTED COPIES OF PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1/29/20 Email from Sam Fossum to CNN Political Plus, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Alan Dershowitz, #3 Exhibit C - 1/29/20 Email from Meredith Richards regarding 4:30 p.m. meeting with Jeff Zucker, #4 Exhibit D - 1/29/20 Emails between Jeff Zucker and Gloria Borger regarding Dershowitz, #5 Exhibit E - 1/29/20 Email from Amanda Wills regarding 4:30 p.m. meeting with Jeff Zucker, #6 Exhibit F - 1/29/20 Email from Pat Wiedenkeller to Paul Begala, #7 Exhibit G - 1/29/20 Email from Jennifer Griffiths regarding Full Circle Research / Impeachment trial latest", #8 Exhibit H - 1/29/20 Email from Paulina Gigante regarding ANCHOR ASSIGNMENTS AND LATEST ANGLES", #9 Exhibit I - Screenshots from CNNs CMS system, #10 Exhibit J - 1/29/20 Slack messages channel regarding video programming, #11 Exhibit K - Contributor Agreement between CNN and Paul Begala, #12 Exhibit L - 1/29/20 Email from Paul Begala to Pat Wiedenkeller with draft commentary, #13 Exhibit M - 1/29/20 Email chain regarding Paul Begalas draft commentary, #14 Exhibit N - 1/29/20 Email from Pat Wiedenkeller to Paul Begala, #15 Exhibit O - 1/29/20 Email chain regarding Paul Begalas draft commentary, #16 Exhibit P - 1/29/20 Email from Pat Wiedenkeller to Paul Begala, #17 Exhibit Q - 1/29/20 Slack messages between Brett Harman and Maryam Mohamed, #18 Exhibit R - Contributors Agreement between CNN and Joe Lockhart, #19 Exhibit S - 1/29/20 Email from Katie Carver regarding Joe Lockharts tweets, #20 Exhibit T - Employment Agreement between CNN and Anderson Cooper, #21 Exhibit U - 1/29/20 Email chain with Chuck Hadad regarding Full Circle, #22 Exhibit V - 1/29/20 Email from John Berman to Melanie Moffitt regarding Dersh-o-nuts, #23 Exhibit W - Online professional biography of Katherine M. Bolger, Esq., #24 Exhibit X - Employment Agreement between CNN and John Berman, #25 Exhibit Y - 2/3/20 Emails to Dershowitz regarding CNN, #26 Exhibit Z - Compilation of press regarding Dershowitz with hyperlinks to pieces, #27 Exhibit AA - Compilation of Twitter tweets regarding Dershowitz, #28 Exhibit BB - Society of Professional Journalists Code of Ethics, #29 Exhibit CC - Contributors Agreement between CNN and Anne Milgram, #30 Exhibit DD - 1/29/20 3:00 p.m. Article by Nikki Carvajal regarding Dershowitz) (Schweikert, Mark)
December 23, 2022 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment held on 12/16/2022 before Judge Raag Singhal, 1-108 pages, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2023. (Shires, Karl)
December 20, 2022 Filing 284 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #272 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 261 Order, to District Court , "CLARIFYING" PRIOR ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Schweikert, Mark)
December 19, 2022 Filing 283 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2022 re 213 Defendant's SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Total time in court: 2 hours : 45 minutes. Attorney Appearances: George S. LeMieux, Katherine M. Bolger, Mark A Schweikert, and John B. Williams. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
December 16, 2022 Filing 282 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. of Redacted Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) (Edison, Eric)
December 16, 2022 Filing 281 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. of Filing Redacted Copy of Defendant's Reply & Exhibits to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Reply to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 161, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 162, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 163, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 164, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 165, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 167, #8 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 169) (Edison, Eric)
December 16, 2022 Filing 280 NOTICE OF FILING by Cable News Network, Inc. re #278 Order on Motion to Seal of Filing Redacted Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Hunt November 28th Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Hunt's Order of November 28, 2022) (Edison, Eric) Modified text on 12/19/2022 (ebz).
December 15, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 279 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (982770)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #275 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #276 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
December 13, 2022 Filing 276 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom for the Summary Judgment Hearing on December 16, 2022 by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 12/27/2022 (Schweikert, Mark)
December 13, 2022 Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Clarifying Prior Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel per Local Rule 5.4 by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #273 Plaintiff's Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2018-79, the motion must include the specific electronic equipment that will be brought into the courtroom, i.e., Apple iPhone, Dell Laptop, etc. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/13/2022. (pb00)
December 13, 2022 Filing 273 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom for Summary Judgment Hearing on December 16, 2022 by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 12/27/2022 (Schweikert, Mark)
December 12, 2022 Filing 272 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 261 Order, to District Court , "CLARIFYING" PRIOR ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alan Dershowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Email to Magistrate Judge's Law Clerk)(Schweikert, Mark)
December 12, 2022 Filing 271 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #209 Order on Motion to Seal Notice of Filing Redacted Copies of Supporting Evidence Relied Upon in Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001, #2 Exhibit 002, #3 Exhibit 003, #4 Exhibit 004, #5 Exhibit 005, #6 Exhibit 006, #7 Exhibit 007, #8 Exhibit 008, #9 Exhibit 009, #10 Exhibit 010, #11 Exhibit 011, #12 Exhibit 012, #13 Exhibit 013, #14 Exhibit 014, #15 Exhibit 015, #16 Exhibit 016, #17 Exhibit 017, #18 Exhibit 018, #19 Exhibit 019, #20 Exhibit 020, #21 Exhibit 021, #22 Exhibit 022, #23 Exhibit 023, #24 Exhibit 024, #25 Exhibit 025, #26 Exhibit 026, #27 Exhibit 027, #28 Exhibit 028, #29 Exhibit 029, #30 Exhibit 030, #31 Exhibit 031, #32 Exhibit 032, #33 Exhibit 033, #34 Exhibit 034, #35 Exhibit 035, #36 Exhibit 036, #37 Exhibit 037, #38 Exhibit 038, #39 Exhibit 039, #40 Exhibit 040, #41 Exhibit 041, #42 Exhibit 042, #43 Exhibit 043, #44 Exhibit 044, #45 Exhibit 045, #46 Exhibit 046, #47 Exhibit 047, #48 Exhibit 048, #49 Exhibit 049, #50 Exhibit 050, #51 Exhibit 051, #52 Exhibit 052, #53 Exhibit 053, #54 Exhibit 054, #55 Exhibit 055, #56 Exhibit 056, #57 Exhibit 057, #58 Exhibit 058, #59 Exhibit 059, #60 Exhibit 060, #61 Exhibit 061, #62 Exhibit 062, #63 Exhibit 063, #64 Exhibit 064, #65 Exhibit 065, #66 Exhibit 066, #67 Exhibit 067, #68 Exhibit 068, #69 Exhibit 069, #70 Exhibit 070, #71 Exhibit 071, #72 Exhibit 072, #73 Exhibit 073, #74 Exhibit 074, #75 Exhibit 075, #76 Exhibit 076, #77 Exhibit 077, #78 Exhibit 078, #79 Exhibit 079, #80 Exhibit 080, #81 Exhibit 081, #82 Exhibit 082, #83 Exhibit 083, #84 Exhibit 084, #85 Exhibit 085, #86 Exhibit 086, #87 Exhibit 087, #88 Exhibit 088, #89 Exhibit 089, #90 Exhibit 090, #91 Exhibit 091, #92 Exhibit 092, #93 Exhibit 093, #94 Exhibit 094, #95 Exhibit 095, #96 Exhibit 096, #97 Exhibit 097, #98 Exhibit 098, #99 Exhibit 099, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit 108, #109 Exhibit 109, #110 Exhibit 110, #111 Exhibit 111, #112 Exhibit 112, #113 Exhibit 113, #114 Exhibit 114, #115 Exhibit 115, #116 Exhibit 116, #117 Exhibit 117, #118 Exhibit 118, #119 Exhibit 119, #120 Exhibit 120, #121 Exhibit 121, #122 Exhibit 122, #123 Exhibit 123, #124 Exhibit 124, #125 Exhibit 125, #126 Exhibit 126, #127 Exhibit 127, #128 Exhibit 128, #129 Exhibit 129, #130 Exhibit 130, #131 Exhibit 131, #132 Exhibit 132, #133 Exhibit 133, #134 Exhibit 134, #135 Exhibit 135, #136 Exhibit 136, #137 Exhibit 137, #138 Exhibit 138, #139 Exhibit 139, #140 Exhibit 140, #141 Exhibit 141, #142 Exhibit 142, #143 Exhibit 143, #144 Exhibit 144, #145 Exhibit 145, #146 Exhibit 146, #147 Exhibit 147, #148 Exhibit 148, #149 Exhibit 149, #150 Exhibit 150, #151 Exhibit 151, #152 Exhibit 152, #153 Exhibit 153, #154 Exhibit 154, #155 Exhibit 155, #156 Exhibit 156, #157 Exhibit 157, #158 Exhibit 158, #159 Exhibit 159, #160 Exhibit 160) (Edison, Eric)
December 12, 2022 Filing 270 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #209 Order on Motion to Seal Notice of Filing Redacted Copies of Supporting Evidence to Its Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Alan Dershowitz [DE 211] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Edison, Eric)
December 12, 2022 Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 10/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt, 1-33 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2023. (jes)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #267 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
December 9, 2022 Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom on December 16, 2022 by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2022 (Edison, Eric)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #265 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Neil H. Koslowe, Esq. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/7/2022. (pb00)
December 6, 2022 Filing 265 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for NEIL H. KOSLOWE. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16151471 by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 12/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Schweikert, Mark)
December 2, 2022 Filing 262 RESPONSE in Support re #212 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of Frank O. Bowman, III filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Schweikert, Mark)
December 2, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 263 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (982770)
December 2, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 264 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (982770)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 PAPERLESS ORDER clarifying this Court's #248 Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel [223) at the request of the Parties. The Order should be read as requiring that Plaintiff turn over the requested information as to any entity or individual that has provided funding for this action as well as any entity or individual that has donated to the Alan Dershowitz Legal Defense Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/28/2022. (hhr)
November 25, 2022 Filing 260 NOTICE of Compliance with Order to File Redacted Versions of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Alan Dershowtiz (Attachments: #1 Memorandum PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Memorandum PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND COUNTER STATEMENT TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS) (Schweikert, Mark)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Granting #242 Motion to Stay. Calendar Call set for 5/5/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Raag Singhal. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 258 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2022 re #242 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines, Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Order forthcoming. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): George S. LeMieux, Eric Corey Edison, Katherine M. Bolger, Mark A Schweikert, John B. Williams. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #242 Unopposed Motion to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines. Hearing will be held on November 21, 2022, at 4:00 P.M. (EDT) via Zoom. The parties can access the hearing using the following link: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 160 759 8368 Password: 7546If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607598368?pwd=U0l2d01zTWxWSjI5UkZmanN1Tk03dz09 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/15/2022. (pb00)
November 14, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 255 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb)
November 13, 2022 Filing 254 NOTICE by Alan Dershowtiz OF FILING INDEX OF EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF FACTS (Schweikert, Mark)
November 11, 2022 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #212 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of Frank O. Bowman, III filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 11/18/2022. (Edison, Eric)
November 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 252 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1153006)
November 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 253 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1153006)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #249 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Zoom Hearing Set for November 28, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. Due to Counsel's Pre-Planned Surgery and Other Scheduling Conflicts. Hearing on #242 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines, Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alan Dershowtiz, set for 11/21/2022 at 04:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal via Zoom. A Zoom link will be provided at a later date. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/10/2022. (pb00)
November 10, 2022 Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Zoom Hearing Set for November 28, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. Due to Counsel's Pre-Planned Surgery and Other Scheduling Conflicts re Set/Reset Hearings,, by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Schweikert, Mark)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #223 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #245 CNN's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. CNN may file a Motion in Limine not exceeding 25 pages in length. Furthermore, the deadline for filing the Motion in Limine will be stayed pending resolution of #242 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines. The previous deadline to file Motions in Limine is vacated for both parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/9/2022. (pb00)
November 9, 2022 Filing 246 NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED DECLARATION OF JOHN B. WILLIAMS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S #242 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines, Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Filing CORRECTED Declaration of John B. Williams, Esq. (Schweikert, Mark) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (ebz).
November 9, 2022 Filing 245 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendant's Motions in Limine by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
November 9, 2022 Filing 244 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #241 Notice (Other),Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 243 Response/Reply (Other). It is not necessary to refile this document. (ebz)
November 9, 2022 Filing 243 RESPONSE TO CNN'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF ALAN DERSHOWITZ #236 Notice (Other), by Alan Dershowtiz. See DE #241 for image. (ebz)
November 9, 2022 Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines, Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 11/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John B. Williams, Esq.)(Schweikert, Mark)
November 9, 2022 Filing 241 NOTICE by Alan Dershowtiz re #236 Notice (Other), of Withdrawing Opposition to CNN's Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Alan Dershowitz (Schweikert, Mark)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #242 Unopposed Motion to Stay Trial Date and Deadlines. Hearing will be held on November 28, 2022, at 4:00 P.M. (EDT) via Zoom. The parties can access the hearing using the following link: # Zoom Link Meeting ID: 160 079 8104Password: 7546If the link does not work, paste this link information into your address bar and go: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1600798104?pwd=djltY1NTd2VJU0w2eGF5RG84RG9GUT09 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/9/2022. (pb00)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER on Pretrial Instructions and Order Setting Hearing on 213 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Hearing set for 12/16/2022 at 1:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
October 26, 2022 Filing 239 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2022 re #223 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 7 filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 00 minutes. (Digital 13:59:22 - 14:48:00) (tw)
October 25, 2022 Filing 238 Defendant's REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re #223 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 7 filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (ebz).
October 25, 2022 Filing 237 NOTICE of Striking #233 Notice (Other) filed by Cable News Network, Inc. by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
October 25, 2022 Filing 236 NOTICE OF FILING UNREDACTED MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF ALAN DERSHOWITZ AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cable News Network, Inc. re #209 Order on Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Motion to Preclude Expert Witness Testimony of Alan Dershowitz and Incorporated Memorandum of Law) (LeMieux, George) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (ebz).
October 25, 2022 Filing 235 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED STATEMENT OF FACTS by Cable News Network, Inc. re #209 Order on Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Redacted Statement of Facts) (LeMieux, George) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (ebz).
October 25, 2022 Filing 234 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Cable News Network, Inc. re #209 Order on Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment) (LeMieux, George) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (ebz).
October 25, 2022 Filing 233 STRICKEN. NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #209 Order on Motion to Seal of Filing Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment) (Edison, Eric) Modified per DE #237 Notice of Striking on 10/26/2022 (ebz).
October 25, 2022 Filing 232 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re 225 Order on Motion to Seal, #223 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 7 OF FILING REDACTED EXHIBIT B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Amended (Post Meet & Confer) Responses to CNN's First Set of Interrogatories REDACTED) (Edison, Eric)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #223 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2022 at 2 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/25/2022. (hhr)
October 25, 2022 Filing 230 NOTICE of Striking #227 Notice (Other), filed by Cable News Network, Inc., 228 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney,, by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
October 25, 2022 Filing 229 CLERK'S NOTICE of Sealing re 225 Order on Motion to Seal. (pes)
October 25, 2022 Filing 228 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #227 Notice (Other),. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz)
October 25, 2022 Filing 227 STRICKEN. NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re 225 Order on Motion to Seal, #223 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 7 OF FILING REDACTED EXHIBIT B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Amended (Post Meet & Confer) Responses to CNN's First Set of Interrogatories REDACTED) (Edison, Eric) Modified per DE #230 Notice of Striking on 10/25/2022 (ebz).
October 25, 2022 Filing 226 RESPONSE in Opposition re #223 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 7 filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 11/1/2022. (Schweikert, Mark)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #224 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of the Court shall seal Docket Entry 223-2, and CNN shall upload a redacted filing. Matters unsealed upon case closing {US0YT}. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/25/2022. (hhr)
October 24, 2022 Filing 224 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Docket Entry 223-2 per Local Rule 5.4 by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edison, Eric)
October 24, 2022 Filing 223 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 7 by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B -- Responses and Objections to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit D -- Plaintiff's Counsel's Correspondence, #4 Exhibit E -- Plaintiff's Supplemental Answer)(Edison, Eric)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on 196 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2022 at 2 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/18/2022. (hhr)
October 13, 2022 Filing 221 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of a USB Drive re #210 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Cable News Network, Inc. (ebz)
October 12, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 218 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 12, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 219 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (982770)
October 12, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 217 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 12, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 220 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (982770)
October 11, 2022 Filing 212 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of Frank O. Bowman, III by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bowman Expert Report)(Schweikert, Mark)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONVENTIONALLY FILE EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION #208 Motion for Leave to File, is GRANTED. CNN is permitted to conventionally file with the Clerk of Court a flash drive containing audio and/or video recordings in support of CNNs Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 211 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 215 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 216 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 213 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 11, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 214 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (703359)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting in part #207 Joint Motion to Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Motions and supporting evidence. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
October 10, 2022 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Conventional Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
October 6, 2022 Filing 207 Joint MOTION to Seal Motions and Exhibits in Support of or in Response to Motions for Summary Judgment / Daubert Motions per Local Rule 5.4 by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edison, Eric)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #204 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff may file under seal all confidential information contained in his Reply in support of his Motion to Compel. Matters unsealed upon case closing {US0YT}. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/4/2022. (hhr)
September 29, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 205 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1153006)
September 28, 2022 Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Motion to Compel per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Schweikert, Mark)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #202 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 10/11/2022. Responses due by 11/11/2022. Replies due by 12/2/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
September 27, 2022 Filing 202 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Pre-Trial Motions and Daubert Motions re #185 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2022 (Edison, Eric)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #199 Motion to Seal. Ms. Milgram may file under seal all confidential information contained in and referenced in her forthcoming Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions. By agreement of the Parties Ms. Milgram's Memorandum shall be filed on or before September 23, 2022. Matters unsealed upon case closing {US0YT} Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 9/23/2022. (hhr)
September 23, 2022 Filing 199 MOTION to file under seal re 195 Order on Motion to Seal, by Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A-Proposed Order)(Wellikoff, Scott) Modified relief to Motion to Seal on 9/23/2022 (kpe).
September 23, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 201 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1342465)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. Joint Motion for Leave to Extend Page Limitations for Summary Judgment Motions and Statements of Material Fact (Joint Motion) DE #197 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 21, 2022 Filing 197 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Motions and Statements of Material Fact by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #194 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff may file under seal all confidential information contained in and attached to his forthcoming motion, including the deposition transcripts of Anne Milgram. Matters unsealed upon case closing {US0YT}. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 9/15/2022. (hhr)
September 15, 2022 Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION to Seal CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN FORTHCOMING MOTION per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Schweikert, Mark)
September 15, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 196 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1153006)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying #190 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Extend the Remaining Pretrial Deadlines, and to Briefly Postpone the Trial Due to Plaintiff's New Lead Counsel's Scheduling Conflict. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
September 9, 2022 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #190 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Remaining Pre-trial Deadlines, Including for Plaintiff's Deposition, and for Brief Continuance of Trial Date Due to Plaintiff's New Lead Trial Counsel's Scheduling Conflicts filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 9/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Edison, Eric)
September 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #190 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Remaining Pre-trial Deadlines, Including for Plaintiff's Deposition, and for Brief Continuance of Trial Date Due to Plaintiff's New Lead Trial Counsel's Scheduling Conflicts . Per DE 191 Order. Responses due by 9/9/2022 (ebz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 PAPERLESS ORDER Expediting Response to #190 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Remaining Pre-trial Deadlines, Including for Plaintiff's Deposition, and for Brief Continuance of Trial Date Due to Plaintiff's New Lead Trial Counsel's Scheduling Conflicts filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Defendant shall file a response by 12:00 p.m., Friday, 9/9/2022. No reply will be filed unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/7/2022. (pb00)
September 7, 2022 Filing 190 EXPEDITED MOTION Extension of Remaining Pre-trial Deadlines, Including for Plaintiff's Deposition, and for Brief Continuance of Trial Date Due to Plaintiff's New Lead Trial Counsel's Scheduling Conflicts by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A - Declaration of John B. Williams, Esq., #2 Exhibit Ex B - Parties' Counsels' Emails, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Parties' Counsels' Emails, #4 Text of Proposed Order Ex D - Proposed Order)(Schweikert, Mark)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #188 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John B. Williams. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/12/2022. (pb00)
August 11, 2022 Filing 188 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John B. Williams. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15864896 by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 8/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance)(Schweikert, Mark)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re: August 5, 2022 discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
August 5, 2022 Filing 186 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Discovery Hearing held on 8/5/2022. Order to follow. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): George S. LeMieux, Eric J. Feder, Mark A Schweikert, (Digital 15:03:18) (tw)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Rescheduling Trial granting #184 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines and Trial Date. Discovery due by 9/13/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/4/2022. In Limine Motions due by 11/11/2022. Motions due by 10/4/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/13/2023. Calendar Call set for 1/24/2023 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 2, 2022 Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of All Deadlines Following Close of Discovery and the Trial Commencement by Thirty (30) Days by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 8/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Schweikert)(Schweikert, Mark)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re: August 1, 2022 discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
August 1, 2022 Filing 182 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Status Hearing on Discovery Matters held on 8/1/2022. Order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric J. Feder, Mark A Schweikert and George LeMieux, (Digital 15:04:08) (tw)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #154 Motion to Compel; #155 Motion to Compel and for Protective Order; #165 Motion for Protective Order; #167 Motion to Compel; #169 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #179 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/28/2022. (hhr)
July 27, 2022 Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear August 1, 2022 Hearing by Zoom Video Conference or Telephonically by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 8/10/2022 (Edison, Eric)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #171 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Sydney J. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/27/2022. (pb00)
July 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
July 22, 2022 Filing 176 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2022 re #154 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with April 21, 2022 Discovery Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Cable News Network, Inc., #167 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to CNN's Fourth Request for Production filed by Cable News Network, Inc., #165 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Anne Milgram, #169 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery Based Upon New Evidence and for In Camera Review of Allegedly Privileged Document filed by Alan Dershowtiz, #155 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel CNN to Comply with the Court's April 21st Discovery Rulings, to Provide Non-Evasive Interrogatory Answers, and to Permit Depositions During the Last Week of July (or on Weekends If Necessary) MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit CNN from Unilaterally Scheduling Plaintiff's Deposition in a Location Where It Knows He Is Not Available filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): George S. LeMieux, Eric Corey Edison, Katherine M. Bolger, Mark A Schweikert, Rachel Maimin. (Digital 10:33:15) (bse)
July 21, 2022 Filing 175 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #167 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to CNN's Fourth Request for Production filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
July 21, 2022 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #169 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery Based Upon New Evidence and for In Camera Review of Allegedly Privileged Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edison, Eric)
July 21, 2022 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to CNN's Fourth Request for Production filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 7/28/2022. (Schweikert, Mark)
July 21, 2022 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #165 MOTION for Protective Order by Non-Party Anne Milgram filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 7/28/2022. (Schweikert, Mark)
July 20, 2022 Filing 171 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sydney J. Kaplan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15807037 by Anne Milgram. Responses due by 8/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wellikoff, Scott)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Discovery Motion #169 Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2022 at 10:30 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Response due on or before noon on July 21, 2022. Any reply shall be filed on or before July 21, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/20/2022. (hhr)
July 20, 2022 Filing 169 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery Based Upon New Evidence and for In Camera Review of Allegedly Privileged Document by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 8/3/2022 (Schweikert, Mark)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Discovery Motion #167 . Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2022 at 10:30 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Response due on or before July 20, 2022. Any reply shall be filed on or before July 21, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/19/2022. (hhr)
July 19, 2022 Filing 167 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to CNN's Fourth Request for Production by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Edison, Eric)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Discovery Motions #155 #154 #165 . Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2022 at 10:30 a.m. in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Any pending responses are due on or before July 20, 2022. Any replies shall be filed on or before July 21, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/19/2022. (hhr)
July 18, 2022 Filing 165 MOTION for Protective Order by Anne Milgram. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wellikoff, Scott)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #161 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rachel Maimin. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/14/2022. (pb00)
July 14, 2022 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Support re #155 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel CNN to Comply with the Court's April 21st Discovery Rulings, to Provide Non-Evasive Interrogatory Answers, and to Permit Depositions During the Last Week of July (or on Weekends If Necessary) MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit CNN from Unilaterally Scheduling Plaintiff's Deposition in a Location Where It Knows He Is Not Available filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Schweikert, Mark)
July 11, 2022 Filing 162 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #154 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with April 21, 2022 Discovery Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
July 10, 2022 Filing 161 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rachel Maimin. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15777291 by Anne Milgram. Responses due by 7/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Rachel Maimin Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wellikoff, Scott)
July 10, 2022 Filing 160 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott M Wellikoff on behalf of Anne Milgram. Attorney Scott M Wellikoff added to party Anne Milgram(pty:mov). (Wellikoff, Scott)
July 8, 2022 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel CNN to Comply with the Court's April 21st Discovery Rulings, to Provide Non-Evasive Interrogatory Answers, and to Permit Depositions During the Last Week of July (or on Weekends If Necessary) MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit CNN from Unilaterally Scheduling Plaintiff's Deposition in a Location Where It Knows He Is Not Available and for a Protective Order filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Katherine M. Bolger in Support of CNN's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for a Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Declaration, #11 Exhibit K to Declaration)(Edison, Eric)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #156 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Rebuttal Expert Reports. Rebuttal experts shall be disclosed no later than 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/7/2022. (pb00)
July 7, 2022 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with April 21, 2022 Discovery Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Original Responses to CNN's First Request for Production)(Schweikert, Mark)
July 6, 2022 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO EXCHANGE REBUTTAL EXPERT WITNESS SUMMARIES OR REPORTS by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 7/20/2022 (Schweikert, Mark)
July 1, 2022 Filing 155 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel CNN to Comply with the Court's April 21st Discovery Rulings, to Provide Non-Evasive Interrogatory Answers, and to Permit Depositions During the Last Week of July (or on Weekends If Necessary) ( Responses due by 7/15/2022), MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit CNN from Unilaterally Scheduling Plaintiff's Deposition in a Location Where It Knows He Is Not Available by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Emails, #3 Exhibit C - CNN's Supplemental Interrogatory Answers, #4 Exhibit D - Emails)(Schweikert, Mark)
June 29, 2022 Filing 154 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with April 21, 2022 Discovery Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 7/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration)(Edison, Eric)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
June 20, 2022 Filing 151 NOTICE by Alan Dershowtiz re 142 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, OF FILING THE PARTIES' JOINT PROPOSED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER PER THE COURT'S PAPERLESS ORDER 142 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Joint Proposed Amended Protective Order) (Schweikert, Mark)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. CNN's Objection to the Magistrate's Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel DE #113 is OVERRULED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that CNN'S Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order on CNN's Motion to Compel #114 are SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re #144 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Mark A Schweikert representing Dershowtiz, Alan (Plaintiff) terminated. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 13, 2022 Filing 148 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Mark A Schweikert (Schweikert, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PAPERLESS ORDER granting CNN's #145 Motion for Brief Extension of Time to Serve Expert Witness Disclosures. The Motion was filed on the date expert witness disclosure was due. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Nevertheless, the Court will grant the relief requested. Although Plaintiff's counsel does not agree to the brief extension, Plaintiff will not be prejudiced by extending expert disclosures by one additional week. Further, the Court finds that the extension should be granted due to (1) outstanding discovery issues; (2) the recent recusal by the magistrate judge; and (3) defense counsel's family emergency. Expert witness disclosure shall be made by 6/21/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/13/2022. (pb00)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 6/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (bms)
June 13, 2022 Filing 145 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Experts and Provide Expert Witness Summaries re #81 Scheduling Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 6/27/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
June 10, 2022 Filing 144 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Mark A. Schweikert for Brian M. Rodier by Alan Dershowtiz. Attorney Mark A Schweikert added to party Alan Dershowtiz(pty:pla). Responses due by 6/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Schweikert, Mark)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #123 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify the Court's Ruling Pertaining to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Regarding First Set of Interrogatories, Item #4; and DENYING #139 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike CNN's Opposition to the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 6/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING IN PART #118 Plaintiff's Motion to Add "Attorney Eyes Only" Designation to Umbrella Protective Order (the "Motion"). Initially, Plaintiff's proposal for an attorneys' eyes only ("AEO") designation for his tax returns is properly brought before the Court pursuant to paragraph 23 of #48 the Protective Order governing this case. Nevertheless, in the context of this highly contested litigation, Plaintiff's request for an AEO designation that limits access to his tax returns solely to licensed attorneys is too narrow. Although some additional protection may be appropriate, CNN must be able to reasonably share the documents that Plaintiff produces (including his tax returns) with individuals when necessary to effectively litigate the case, which may include, for example, the Court and its staff, experts, and counsel's vendors, assistants, and/or clerical personnel. With this guidance, the parties should be able to resolve the dispute without further Court intervention. Accordingly, within 7 days from the date of this Order, the parties must telephonically meet and confer in a good faith effort to prepare a proposed amended Protective Order for the Court's consideration that includes an AEO designation, resembling the examples described in the briefs on the Motion. Further, unless otherwise agreed to by the parties, they must file the joint proposed amended Protective Order within 10 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 6/10/2022. (sd01)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Cable News Network, Inc. and vacating #127 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court ; denying as moot #138 Defendant's Motion to Unseal Document and #140 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
June 9, 2022 Filing 140 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #138 Defendant's MOTION to Unseal May 6, 2022 Transcript in Support of Motion for Reconsideration by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 6/23/2022 (Rodier, Brian)
June 9, 2022 Filing 139 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #137 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Clarification by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 6/23/2022 (Rodier, Brian)
June 9, 2022 Filing 138 Defendant's MOTION to Unseal May 6, 2022 Transcript in Support of Motion for Reconsideration by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Katherine M. Bolger In Support of Defendant's Motion to Unseal)(Edison, Eric)
June 8, 2022 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #123 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification of Court's April 21, 2022 Order Pertaining to Plaintiff's Interrogatory #4 filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine M. Bolger in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify)(Edison, Eric)
June 7, 2022 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #127 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 6/14/2022. (Rodier, Brian)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #131 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Hilary Oran. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/7/2022. (pb00)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/7/2022. (pb00)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #129 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eric J. Feder. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/7/2022. (pb00)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PAPERLESS ORDER expediting response to #128 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #127 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Response due by 6/10/2022. No reply will be filed absent prior Court order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/6/2022. (pb00)
June 6, 2022 Filing 131 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hilary Oran. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15693012 by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
June 6, 2022 Filing 130 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15692998 by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
June 6, 2022 Filing 129 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric J. Feder. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15692904 by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
June 6, 2022 Filing 128 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re #127 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edison, Eric)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 VACATED ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that CNN's Objections DE #113 and #114 to the Magistrate Judge's Order DE 101 are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz) Modified per DE [141} Order on 6/10/2022 (ebz).
May 31, 2022 Filing 126 CNN'S REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS OBJECTIONS TO CERTAIN RULINGS IN MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S PARTIAL DENIAL OF CNN'S MOTIONS TO COMPLE re #114 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel to District Court as to CNN's Motion to Compel DE #52 and #72 filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric) Modified text on 6/1/2022 (ebz).
May 31, 2022 Filing 125 CNN'S REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS OBJECTION TO PORTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL re #113 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel to District Court as to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel DE #53 filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric) Modified text on 6/1/2022 (ebz).
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Defendant to file replies re #113 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel and #114 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel. Replies are limited to 7 pages and are due by 5/31/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/26/2022. (pb00)
May 25, 2022 Filing 123 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification of Court's April 21, 2022 Order Pertaining to Plaintiff's Interrogatory #4 by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 6/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Rodier with attached notes)(Rodier, Brian)
May 24, 2022 Filing 122 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 Plaintiff's MOTION to Add Attorney Eyes Only Designation to Umbrella Protective Order re #48 Order filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Rodier, Brian)
May 24, 2022 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 Plaintiff's MOTION to Add Attorney Eyes Only Designation to Umbrella Protective Order re #48 Order filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edison, Eric)
May 23, 2022 Filing 120 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #114 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court as to CNN's Motion to Compel (ECFs 52 and 72) by Alan Dershowtiz. (Rodier, Brian)
May 23, 2022 Filing 119 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #113 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court as to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF 53) by Alan Dershowtiz. (Rodier, Brian)
May 17, 2022 Filing 118 Plaintiff's MOTION to Add Attorney Eyes Only Designation to Umbrella Protective Order re #48 Order by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Existing Umbrella Protective Order)(Rodier, Brian)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. ORDERED all future filings shall be docketed with a descriptive name included for each exhibit. The Court will strike any filing that does not comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
May 9, 2022 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Rule 72(a) Objections signed by: Katherine M. Bolger re #113 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court as to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF 53), #114 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court as to CNN's Motion to Compel (ECFs 52 and 72) by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
May 9, 2022 Filing 114 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court as to CNN's Motion to Compel (ECFs 52 and 72) (Edison, Eric)
May 9, 2022 Filing 113 Defendant's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 101 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court as to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF 53) (Edison, Eric)
May 6, 2022 Filing 117 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Telephonic conference held, per the Courts Order at ECF No. 112. The Court denied CNNs and Plaintiffs oral cross-motions for reconsideration regarding certain aspects of the Courts ruling at the April 21, 2022 hearing. The Court granted Defendants unopposed request to seal the transcript of the telephonic conference pending redaction by parties. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): George S. LeMieux, Eric Corey Edison, Katherine M. Bolger, Brian Mitchell Rodier, (SEALED ATT Digital Audio Recording:SEALED AOV_01_5_06_2022) (tpl)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING #109 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Order Sealing Defendant's Motion for Clarification and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule. In lieu of written motions and in an effort to expeditiously address the undersigned's ruling at the April 21, 2022 hearing regarding Request for Production 8, this case is scheduled for a telephonic conference on Friday, May 6, 2022 at 3:00 pm. Shortly before the conference time, the parties shall call (877) 848-7030 and, when prompted, enter Access Code 2004890 followed by #. The conference is limited to 30 minutes and the parties must be prepared to succinctly address the purported need for clarification of this Court's prior ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 5/4/2022. (sd01)
May 4, 2022 Filing 111 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motion for Clarification & Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
May 4, 2022 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motion for Clarification & Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 5/11/2022. (Rodier, Brian)
May 4, 2022 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motion for Clarification & Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule per Local Rule 5.4 by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Unopposed Motion for Entry of Order Sealing Defendant's Motion for Clarification & Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule) (Edison, Eric)
May 2, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of Compliance re 107 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (DE 105 Sealed) (amb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #106 Joint Motion to Seal Hearing Transcript Pending Redactions. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the transcript of the hearing held on April 21, 2022, filed at ECF No. 105 , until further Order of the Court upon a motion for certain redactions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 5/2/2022. (sd01)
April 29, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 105 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb)
April 29, 2022 Filing 106 Joint MOTION To Seal Hearing Transcript Pending Redactions by Alan Dershowtiz. (Rodier, Brian)
April 28, 2022 Filing 104 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cable News Network, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. for Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
April 28, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Striking #97 Notice (Other) filed by Cable News Network, Inc. by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
April 26, 2022 Filing 102 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by John Thornton. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Rodier, Brian)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PAPERLESS ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. This cause comes before the Court upon the Motions listed below. For the reasons stated on the record of the hearing held on April 21, 2022, see ECF No. 100, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: 1.Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Better Responses to Interrogatories and Overrule Objections (ECF No. 51) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART;2.CNN's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatories and Overrule Objections (ECF No. 52) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART;3.Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Better Responses to Requests to Produce and Overrule Objections (ECF No. 53) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART;4.CNN's Motion to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents by Plaintiff (ECF No. 72) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; 5.Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Overrule Objections and Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request to Produce (ECF No. 85) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/21/2022. (sd01)
April 21, 2022 Filing 100 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2022 re ECF numbers #51 , #52 , #53 , #72 , and #85 Motions to Compel. Oral argument heard from both sides. Order to follow. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 50 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): George S. LeMieux, Eric Corey Edison, Katherine M. Bolger, Brian Mitchell Rodier, (Digital Audio Recording: 9:59:45) (tpl)
April 20, 2022 Filing 99 PAPERLESS NOTICE that the Motion Hearing scheduled for April 21, 2022 at 10:00am before US Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle will be held in Courtroom 310 in the Fort Lauderdale Federal Courthouse. (tpl)
April 20, 2022 Filing 98 Clerks Notice to Filer re #97 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
April 19, 2022 Filing 97 STRICKEN NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement (Edison, Eric) Modified per DE #103 NOTICE OF STRIKING on 4/28/2022 (ebz).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING #84 Plaintiff's Motion to Overrule Objections and Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request to Produce, based on the amended Motion filed at ECF No. #85 Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/14/2022. (sd01)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING #85 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Overrule Objections and Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request to Produce (the "Motion"). The Motion is added to the in-person hearing on discovery motions scheduled for April 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. See ECF No. #78 Order Setting Hearing on Discovery Motions; ECF No. 89 Paperless Order Granting Defendants Motion to Amend and ordering that hearing will be held in person. There is no requirement for a Joint Status Report on the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/14/2022. (sd01)
April 13, 2022 Filing 94 STATUS REPORT (Joint Supplemental) in Connection with CNN's Motion to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
April 13, 2022 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 Amended MOTION to Compel Production Related to Plaintiff's Second Request to Produce filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 4/20/2022. (Edison, Eric)
April 13, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Striking #90 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Cable News Network, Inc. by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
April 7, 2022 Filing 91 Clerks Notice to Filer re #90 Response in Opposition to Motion. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz)
April 7, 2022 Filing 90 STRICKEN per DE#92 , RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 Amended MOTION to Compel Production Related to Plaintiff's Second Request to Produce filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 4/14/2022. (Edison, Eric) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (jas).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #86 Defendant's Motion to Amend Order Setting Hearing on Motions. The discovery hearing scheduled for April 21, 2022 at 10:00 am will be held in person. A courtroom designation will follow by separate order one day before the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/7/2022. (js06)
April 5, 2022 Filing 88 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #78 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, and Allow Counsel for the Parties to Appear In-Person filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
April 4, 2022 Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion re #86 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #78 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, and Allow Counsel for the Parties to Appear In-Person filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 4/11/2022. (Rodier, Brian)
April 4, 2022 Filing 86 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #78 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, and Allow Counsel for the Parties to Appear In-Person by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 4/18/2022 (Edison, Eric)
March 31, 2022 Filing 85 Amended MOTION to Compel Production Related to Plaintiff's Second Request to Produce by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 4/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rodier, Brian)
March 31, 2022 Filing 84 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production Related to Second Request to Produce by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 4/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rodier, Brian)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before John W. Thornton, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM. The mediation conference will be held at: JAMS, 600 Brickell Avenue,Suite 2600, Miami, Florida 33131 and via Zoom. All parties and counsel must attend. A mediation report shall be filed by 04/28/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/30/2022. (pb00)
March 30, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #63 ORDER Scheduling Mediation, to Reschedule Mediation for April 25, 2022 (Edison, Eric)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RESCHEDULING TRIAL: (Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 12/2/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Raag Singhal., Discovery due by 8/5/2022., Expert Discovery due by 8/5/2022., Fact Discovery due by 8/5/2022., In Limine Motions due by 10/10/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2022., Motions due by 9/1/2022., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/22/2022.), Motions terminated: #80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline , Remaining Deadlines and Trial for 90 Days is GRANTED, filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 2, 2022 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline , Remaining Deadlines and Trial for 90 Days by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodier, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Filing 79 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents and Memorandum of Law filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Hearing set for 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #76 CNN's Motion to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents by Plaintiff. CNN must separately file its Reply contained within ECF #76 at 4-6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle (sd01)
February 8, 2022 Filing 76 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents by Plaintiff by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
February 7, 2022 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents and Memorandum of Law filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rodier, Brian)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #73 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to disclose experts and exchange expert witnesssummaries or reports shall be extended to March 7, 2022.The deadline for the parties to exchange rebuttal expert witness summaries orreports shall be extended to April 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/3/2022. (pb00)
February 3, 2022 Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines re #34 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 2/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
January 27, 2022 Filing 72 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Pre-January 29, 2020 Documents and Memorandum of Law by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2022 (Edison, Eric)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #67 Defendant's Motion For Leave To File a Brief Supplemental Memorandum to its Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses based on Plaintiff's response that it "does not oppose CNN's desire to file its supplemental memorandum, and in fact welcomes [it.]" ECF No. #69 at 2. Accordingly, the Court will consider the Supplemental Memorandum at Exhibit A of ECF No. #67 . If necessary, within 3 business days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file his response to the Supplemental Memorandum, limited to 5 double-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 1/12/2022. (sd01)
January 11, 2022 Filing 70 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
January 10, 2022 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re #67 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Supplemental Memorandum to Its Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Rodier, Brian)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #62 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting that the Court Accept #60 is Reply Memorandum in Excess of the Page Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 1/6/2022. (sd01)
January 5, 2022 Filing 67 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Supplemental Memorandum to Its Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
December 31, 2021 Filing 66 Consent AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Cable News Network, Inc., filed by Alan Dershowtiz.(Rodier, Brian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE by Alan Dershowtiz of Filing First Amended Complaint By Rule 15(a)(2) Written Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (Rodier, Brian)
December 29, 2021 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before John W. Thornton. Mediation Hearing set for 3/31/2022 10:00 AM. All parties and counsel must attend. A mediation report shall be filed by April 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 22, 2021 Filing 62 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of 5 Page Limit by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodier, Brian)
December 22, 2021 Filing 61 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses and Overrule Objections to Plaintiff's Request to Produce filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Related Reply for Reference)(Rodier, Brian)
December 22, 2021 Filing 60 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Answers To Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Rodier, Brian)
December 22, 2021 Filing 59 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
December 16, 2021 Filing 58 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #54 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
December 15, 2021 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 12/22/2021. (Rodier, Brian)
December 15, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Answers To Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 12/22/2021. (Edison, Eric)
December 15, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses and Overrule Objections to Plaintiff's Request to Produce filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Replies due by 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edison, Eric)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO FILE MEDIATION REPORT. A mediation report shall be filed by December 17, 2021. Alternatively, if the mediation did not occur, the parties shall show cause why mediation did not occur. (Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2021) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 3, 2021 Filing 53 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses and Overrule Objections to Plaintiff's Request to Produce by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Rodier, Brian)
December 3, 2021 Filing 52 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit)(Edison, Eric)
December 3, 2021 Filing 51 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Answers To Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rodier, Brian)
November 23, 2021 Reset Deadlines Per DE#50. Status Report due by 12/29/2021. (cqs)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #49 the Joint Motion to Set A Briefing Scheduling of the Parties Anticipated Motions to Compel (the "Motion"). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that:1. All Motions to Compel related to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production, Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production, and Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production ("Motions to Compel") must be filed by December 3, 2021;2. All responses to such Motions to Compel must be filed by December 15, 2021; and 3. The parties may file reply memoranda to the Motions to Compel by December 22, 2021. The parties must also file a Joint Status Report ("JSR") (discussed below) by December 29, 2021. In advance of the JSR, the parties must telephonically meet and confer in a good faith effort to resolve the issues in the Motions to Compel.4. The JSR must set forth the following information for the unresolved issues: (i) the discovery request; (ii) the discovery response; (iii) a brief summary of each party's position, with one issue per page; and (iv) the result of the parties meet and confer. The parties may group the discovery requests by issue, as appropriate. This information must be presented in chart form as set forth in Exhibit 1. The JSR is not intended to be a verbatim recitation of the parties' briefs. Rather, it is meant to summarize the issues in a comparative format (i.e., one column for movant and one column for opponent) to assist the Court in evaluating the disputed issues. Moreover, if necessary, the disputed discovery requests can be grouped by topic/issue to facilitate analysis. Upon review of the JSR, the Court will determine whether to schedule a hearing on the Motions to Compel. An example of a JSR can be found at Wound Care Concepts, Inc. v. Vora Health Servs., P.A., No. 19-CV-62078-RS (ECF No. 84) (S.D. Fla. July 30, 2020). 5. Lastly, unless otherwise provided in this Order, the parties must follow the undersigned's Discovery Procedures available on the Court's website: https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-alicia-o-valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
November 18, 2021 Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Parties Anticipated Motions to Compel by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING #45 Defendant CNN's Motion for Protective Order (the "Motion"). The parties have reached an impasse as to one provision in their proposed Confidentiality and Protective Order. See generally ECF Nos. #45 , #46 . Upon a review of the competing proposals, the undersigned adopts a modified version of Plaintiff's paragraph 19, as it more clearly sets forth the potential sanctions resulting from overdesignation of materials as confidential. Accordingly, the Court will enter the Confidentiality Order separately, limiting potential sanctions to those available pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including Rule 37. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/17/2021. (sd01)
November 12, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 Defendant's MOTION for Confidentiality Order filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Brian Rodier, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Judge Altonaga Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Rodier, Brian)
November 11, 2021 Filing 45 Defendant's MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Katherine Bolger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Abigail B. Everdell. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/1/2021. (pb00)
November 1, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Abigail B. Everdell. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15138785 by Cable News Network, Inc.. Responses due by 11/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions Pertaining to Discovery Disputes Relating to Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories DE#41 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order to file motions relating to disputes regarding CNN's responses to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 5, 2021 Filing 41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Present Disputes to the Court PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES by Alan Dershowtiz. Responses due by 10/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodier, Brian)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE-SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Honorable John W. Thornton - Mediation Hearing reset for 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 1, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc. re #34 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edison, Eric)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Judge John W. Thornton Mediation Hearing set for 11/17/2021 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 21, 2021 Filing 37 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added John W. Thornton, Jr as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
July 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Compliance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) by Cable News Network, Inc. re #34 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, (Edison, Eric)
July 12, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Compliance with Service of Initial Disclosures by Alan Dershowtiz (Rodier, Brian)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 9/9/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2021., Discovery due by 5/6/2022., Expert Discovery due by 5/6/2022., Fact Discovery due by 5/6/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 8/20/2021., Mediation Deadline 5/27/2022., In Limine Motions due by 7/11/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2022., Motions due by 6/2/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/26/2022), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 5/27/2022), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 21, 2021 Filing 33 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Cable News Network, Inc. (Edison, Eric)
June 16, 2021 Filing 32 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Edison, Eric)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by Cable News Network, Inc. Answer due 6/16/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/3/2021. (pb00)
June 3, 2021 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
May 11, 2021 Filing 27 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2021 re #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): George S. LeMieux, Eric Corey Edison, Amanda Levine, Katherine M. Bolger, Brian Mitchell Rodier. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING ZOOM HEARING on Motion #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING on Motion #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Edison, Eric)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS. Response due by 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/28/2020. (eca)
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #21 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alan Dershowtiz. Replies due by 12/28/2020. (Rodier, Brian)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. Response due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/17/2020. (pb00)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodier, Brian)
November 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kpe)
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. Responses due by 11/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration of Dan Riner)(Edison, Eric)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits. Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. shall conventionally file flash drive(s) and a paperback book in support of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/4/2020. (pb00)
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Response to Complaint by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Edison, Eric)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Amanda B. Levine. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/8/2020. (pb00)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Katherine M. Bolger. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/8/2020. (pb00)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Amanda B. Levine. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13653355 by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. Responses due by 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Katherine M. Bolger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13653192 by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. Responses due by 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Response/Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Alan Dershowtiz due 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/7/2020. (pb00)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Inc. for CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Edison, Eric)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edison, Eric)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Corey Edison on behalf of CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Eric Corey Edison added to party CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.(pty:dft). (Edison, Eric)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George S. LeMieux on behalf of CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. Attorney George S. LeMieux added to party CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.(pty:dft). (LeMieux, George)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alan Dershowtiz. CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Rodier, Brian)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/16/2020. (pb00)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (kpe)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13523717, filed by Alan Dershowtiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Rodier, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dershowitz v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Dershowtiz
Represented By: Brian Mitchell Rodier
Represented By: Mark A Schweikert
Represented By: John B. Williams
Represented By: Neil H. Koslowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: George S. LeMieux
Represented By: Katherine M. Bolger
Represented By: Eric Corey Edison
Represented By: Amanda Levine
Represented By: Amanda B. Levine
Represented By: Abigail B. Everdell
Represented By: Eric J. Feder
Represented By: Hilary Oran
Represented By: Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?