Tillman v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Jassid Tillman
Defendant: LDF Holdings, LLC, RBC Servicing, LLC, The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel, Skytrail Servicing Group, LLC, Andrew Robert Dunn, Niswi, LLC, William C. Pruett, Eric Welch, Pinnacle Acquisitions, LLC, Niizhwaaswi, LLC, Creditserve, Inc., Blue Dart Ventures, LLC and Arrow One
Case Number: 0:2020cv61942
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 21 Order: Arrow One response due 12/4/2020; Blue Dart Ventures, LLC response due 12/4/2020. (kpe)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Arrow One and Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Arrow One, Blue Dart Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
November 18, 2020 Filing 19 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Jassid Tillman as to Creditserve, Inc.. (Geiger, Bryan)
November 11, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jassid Tillman. Skytrail Servicing Group, LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Geiger, Bryan)
November 11, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jassid Tillman. RBC Servicing, LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Geiger, Bryan)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Arrow One and Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Arrow One, Blue Dart Ventures, LLC. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Arrow One(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Blue Dart Ventures, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed order)(Foster, Zachary)
November 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jassid Tillman. Pinnacle Acquisitions, LLC served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Geiger, Bryan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Andrew Robert Dunn, William C. Pruett, and Eric Welch, without prejudice by Jassid Tillman (Geiger, Bryan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Arrow One. (nc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, Creditserve, Inc., Andrew Robert Dunn, LDF Holdings, LLC, Niizhwaaswi, LLC, Niswi, LLC, Pinnacle Acquisitions, LLC, William C. Pruett, RBC Servicing, LLC, Skytrail Servicing Group, LLC, Eric Welch, Arrow One, filed by Jassid Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summon(s))(Geiger, Bryan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel only, without prejudice by Jassid Tillman (Geiger, Bryan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jassid Tillman. LDF Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020; Niizhwaaswi, LLC waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020; Niswi, LLC waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Geiger, Bryan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated secondary email information for attorney Bryan J. Geiger re #7 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney has not followed the procedures for updating their secondary email information with the Court. The Court is not responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bryan J. Geiger (Geiger, Bryan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jassid Tillman. The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Geiger, Bryan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jassid Tillman. Blue Dart Ventures, LLC served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Geiger, Bryan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Dart Ventures, LLC, Creditserve, Inc., Andrew Robert Dunn, LDF Holdings, LLC, Niizhwaaswi, LLC, Niswi, LLC, Pinnacle Acquisitions, LLC, William C. Pruett, RBC Servicing, LLC, Skytrail Servicing Group, LLC, The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel, Eric Welch. (kpe)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13572288, filed by Jassid Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Geiger, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDF Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skytrail Servicing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Robert Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niswi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Pruett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niizhwaaswi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creditserve, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Dart Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Scott Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow One
Represented By: Zachary Scott Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jassid Tillman
Represented By: Bryan J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?