Ruiz Garcia v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Danny Ruiz Garcia
Defendant: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 0:2020cv62162
Filed: October 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 First REPLY to #10 Response/Reply (Other), to Government's Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Danny Ruiz Garcia. (Gutierrez, Julio)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Alinikoff, Miriam)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miriam Alinikoff on behalf of Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft). (Alinikoff, Miriam)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (dpr)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $5.00, receipt number AFLSDC-13817257 re 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Gutierrez, Julio)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Docket Entry #1 Electronic Case. This payment cannot be accepted. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $5.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (bb)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Cover Sheet by Danny Ruiz Garcia re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, (Gutierrez, Julio) Modified docket text on 10/27/2020 (nc).
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
October 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. (kpe)
October 25, 2020 Filing 1 Plaintiff's APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-203645102, payment transferred from : Danny Ruiz Garcia v Michael W. Meade, filed by Danny Ruiz Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum and verification in support of petition for habeas corpus, #2 Appendix Appendix for petition for habeas corpus)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Gutierrez, Julio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz Garcia v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ruiz Garcia
Represented By: Julio Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Miriam Alinikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?