Bethesda Health, Inc. et al v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Bethesda Health, Inc. doing business as Bethesda Memorial Hospital, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, Inc. and South Broward Hospital District doing business as Memorial Regional Hospital
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II and Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 0:2020cv62206
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark D. Polston. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/3/2020. (eca)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Polston. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13790962 by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District. Responses due by 11/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, J.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District (Taylor, J.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District (Taylor, J.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pes)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13783850, filed by Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., South Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Taylor, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethesda Health, Inc. et al v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethesda Health, Inc. doing business as Bethesda Memorial Hospital
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarasota Memorial Hospital
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naples Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District doing business as Memorial Regional Hospital
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?