North Broward Hospital District v. Yoshida et al
Plaintiff: North Broward Hospital District
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC and Akikazu Yoshida
Case Number: 0:2020cv62267
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC (Dixon, Justin)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC identifying Corporate Parent GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent North Broward Hospital Distict, Other Affiliate Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate Florida Blue, Other Affiliate Benihana National Corp., Other Affiliate Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina for BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC (Dixon, Justin)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC. Responses due by 11/25/2020 (Conner, Tim)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13822644,no answer/affirmative defenses filed by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Docket)(Conner, Tim)Text Modified on 11/6/2020 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Broward Hospital District v. Yoshida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Broward Hospital District
Represented By: Edward M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mansfield
Represented By: Tim J Conner
Represented By: Justin Wade Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akikazu Yoshida
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mansfield
Represented By: Tim J Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?