Cohan v. LQ Management L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: LQ Management L.L.C. a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as La Quinta and CPLG FL Properties L.L.C. a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as La Quinta
Case Number: 0:2020cv62458
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Closing Case (Stipulation of Dismissal due 1/18/2021). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Status Conference, (Joint Notice of Compliance due 12/18/2020). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on 12/14/2020. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Gregory Steven Sconzo, Dale Evans Jr. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5686 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mpt)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/5/2021 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES: Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Howard Cohan. CPLG FL Properties L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Sconzo, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CPLG FL Properties L.L.C.. (pcs)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Howard Cohan re #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Howard Cohan (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Sconzo, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CPLG FL Properties L.L.C., filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LQ Management L.L.C.. (pcs)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LQ Management L.L.C.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13965271, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. LQ Management L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management L.L.C. a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as La Quinta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG FL Properties L.L.C. a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as La Quinta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?