Myeress v. Elite Travel Group USA
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Elite Travel Group USA
Case Number: 0:2020mc61162
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. Elite Travel Group USA is DISCHARGED on the Answer and is released from any further liability under the Writ of Garnishment. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED and DIRECTED to pay to Elite Travel Group USA the sum of $100 as deposited in the court registry for attorneys' fees expended in obtaining representation in response to the writ. See Fla. Stat. 77.28. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Elite Travel Group USA. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 7/15/2020. (Raikhelson, Andre)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andre G. Raikhelson on behalf of Elite Travel Group USA. Attorney Andre G. Raikhelson added to party Elite Travel Group USA(pty:dft). (Raikhelson, Andre)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Elite Travel Group USA in the amount of $ 27,950.00 re: #3 Motion for Writ filed by Joe Myeress. (kpe)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Elite Travel Group USA, Inc. by Joe Myeress. (Rothman, Joel)
June 12, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (kpe)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (kpe)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment . Filing fee $47.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13021066, filed by Joe Myeress.(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Elite Travel Group USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Travel Group USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?