Arevalo v. Doe U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration Agents #1 through #5 et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Arevalo
Defendant: DOE U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINSTRATION AGENTS #1 through #5, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, Executive Office for the United States Attorney, U.S. Department of Justice, UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA and Doe U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration Agents #1 through #5
Case Number: 0:2021cv60102
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants United States Drug Enforcement Administration and Executive Office of the United States Attorneys. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/15/2021. (cbn)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice c/o U.S. Attorney's Office (nc)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA,(nc)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Miguel Arevalo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Summon(s) USAO SUMMONS, #10 Summon(s) DOJ SUMMONS)(Light, Gregory)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Executive Office for the United States Attorney, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. Attorney Johnathan Douglas Lott added to party Executive Office for the United States Attorney(pty:dft), Attorney Johnathan Douglas Lott added to party U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/11/2021 (Lott, Johnathan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance with [DE 5] by Miguel Arevalo re 5 Order on Motion to Seal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B- Redacted, #2 Exhibit E- Redacted) (Light, Gregory)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits Attached to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk has sealed Exhibits B [DE 1-2] and E [DE 1-5]. The Exhibits shall remain sealed until further order of the Court. Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of Exhibits B and E in the public record by January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/21/2021. (cbn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT per Local Rule 5.4 by Miguel Arevalo. (Light, Gregory)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Doe U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration Agents #1 through #5, Executive Office for the United States Attorney, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (kpe)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14226060, filed by Miguel Arevalo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summon(s) USAO, #7 Summon(s) DOE Defendants, #8 Summon(s) DEA, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arevalo v. Doe U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration Agents #1 through #5 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINSTRATION AGENTS #1 through #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Johnathan Douglas Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for the United States Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Johnathan Douglas Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration Agents #1 through #5
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Arevalo
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Light
Represented By: Anthony Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?