CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON Subscribing to PolicyNo. 3CPO-l60097 et al v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Plaintiff: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON Subscribing to Policy No. NA-160082, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON Subscribing to PolicyNo. 3CPO-l60097, Ironshore Insurance LTD and LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co., THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. doing business as The Home Depot. and Emerson Electric Co. doing business as Ridgid & Ridgid Power Tools
Case Number: 0:2021cv60119
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #7 Order Remanding Case to State Court, #8 Transmittal Letter Sent (cds)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Transmittal Letter Sent with With Certified Copies to: Seventeenth Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: CACE 20-021903 (cds)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REMAND. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal DE #4 is GRANTED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS Order to Vacate #5 Order Dismissing Case. An Order of Remand will be entered separately. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/26/2021. (jhy)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (VACATED PER DE#6)ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #4 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Emerson Electric Co., Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) Text Modified on 1/26/2021 (cqs).
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Emerson Electric Co., Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. Responses due by 2/8/2021 (King, Courtney)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/21/2021. (jhy)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE SEVENTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR BROWARD COUNTY, FLORIDA) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14240553, filed by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit NOF Notice of Removal (State) - Exhibit B)(King, Courtney) Text Modified on 1/20/2021 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON Subscribing to PolicyNo. 3CPO-l60097 et al v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON Subscribing to Policy No. NA-160082
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON Subscribing to PolicyNo. 3CPO-l60097
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironshore Insurance LTD
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. doing business as The Home Depot.
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Scott Alan Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co. doing business as Ridgid & Ridgid Power Tools
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Scott Alan Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?