Imperial Fund I, LLC v. Bim's Investments, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Imperial Fund I, LLC
Defendant: Abimbola Orukotan and Bim's Investments, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv60162
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT as to Reasonable Attorneys' Fees signed by: Brendan A. Sweeney re #26 Affidavit by Imperial Fund I, LLC (Siwiec, Monika)
March 11, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney as to Costs and Fees signed by: Monika E. Siwiec by Imperial Fund I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Siwiec, Monika)
March 10, 2021 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #21 Transmittal Letter Sent. (jas)
March 4, 2021 Filing 24 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Abimbola Orukotan. Date received by USCA: 3/2/21. USCA Case Number: 21-10681-CC. (hh)
March 2, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Notice of Appeal Instructions re #22 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
March 2, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
March 1, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appeal as to #20 Order Remanding Case to State Court by Abimbola Orukotan. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz)
February 26, 2021 Filing 21 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Granting Motion for Remand to: 17th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: CACE-19-003280 (kpe)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
February 23, 2021 Filing 19 Removal STATUS REPORT and Request for Judicial Notice by Abimbola Orukotan. (kpe)
February 17, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to #17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Imperial Fund I, LLC. (Siwiec, Monika)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 Opposition to Plaintiff's #12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Abimbola Orukotan. Replies due by 2/24/2021. (kpe)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Planning and Scheduling Report - Rule 16.1 by Abimbola Orukotan. (kpe)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Imperial Fund I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Related Omnibus Order) (Siwiec, Monika)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imperial Fund I, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Imperial Fund II, LLC, Other Affiliate Imperial Fund Trust 2019-1, Other Affiliate Imperial Fund Mortgage Depositer LLC for Imperial Fund I, LLC (Siwiec, Monika)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 Order to Show Cause by Imperial Fund I, LLC. (Siwiec, Monika)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Imperial Fund I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Siwiec, Monika)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monika Elizabeth Siwiec on behalf of Imperial Fund I, LLC. Attorney Monika Elizabeth Siwiec added to party Imperial Fund I, LLC(pty:pla). (Siwiec, Monika)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Motions Pending on Removal to this Court by Abimbola Orukotan. (kpe)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Abimbola Orukotan. (kpe)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 2/22/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (kbm)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Abimbola Orukotan. (drz)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Certification Of Possession Of The Original Promissory Note) Filing fee $402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Abimbola Orukotan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imperial Fund I, LLC v. Bim's Investments, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abimbola Orukotan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bim's Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imperial Fund I, LLC
Represented By: Evan Russell Raymond
Represented By: Monika Elizabeth Siwiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?