Gregorio v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Gregorio
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 0:2021cv60372
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Gregorio. Attorney Joel L. Oster added to party Michael Gregorio(pty:pla). (Oster, Joel)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that attorney Howard Weil Rubinstein has not been added to this case re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),. For further information, please contact Attorney Admissions at 305-523-5265. (cco)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Edson, Scott)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Edson, Scott)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14395797, filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Pleadings from lower court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edson, Scott) No answer/motion to dismissed filed. Modified text on 2/17/2021 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregorio v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gregorio
Represented By: Joel L. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Scott Michael Edson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?