The Learning Experience Systems LLC et al v. Wisdom Child Education LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC and THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP.
Defendant: Wisdom Child Education LLC, Mamatha Vulli and Sreenivas Vulli
Case Number: 0:2021cv60472
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
2 Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, AND/OR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Mamatha Vulli, Sreenivas Vulli. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 20, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, AND/OR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Mamatha Vulli, Sreenivas Vulli, Wisdom Child Education LLC. Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party Wisdom Child Education LLC(pty:dft). (Cohen, Darci)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Notice (Other),. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (jas)
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Correcting Portion of Case Number on Plaintiffs' Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Enforce Settlement Agreement by The Learning Experience Corp., The Learning Experience Systems LLC re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Correcting Portion of Case Number (Sigalos, George) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (jas).
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Electronic Filing (NEF's) have been Updated for Darci Cohen to Receive Notices. (jc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, AND/OR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and Memorandum of Law filed by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP., THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Weissman in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Enforce Settlement Agreement, #2 Declaration of Jason Kislin in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Enforce Settlement Agreement [DE 10], #3 Declaration of George L.Sigalos in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Enforce Settlement Agreement)(Sigalos, George)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/5/2021. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP., THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC (Sigalos, George)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/7/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, AND/OR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Mamatha Vulli, Sreenivas Vulli. Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party Mamatha Vulli(pty:dft), Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party Sreenivas Vulli(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Cohen, Darci)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC, THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP.. Mamatha Vulli served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Sigalos, George)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC, THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP.. Sreenivas Vulli served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Sigalos, George)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC, THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP.. Wisdom Child Education LLC served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Sigalos, George)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP., THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Learning Experience Holdings, LLC for THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP. (Sigalos, George)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mamatha Vulli, Sreenivas Vulli, Wisdom Child Education LLC. (ail)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP., THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC re #1 Complaint,, filed by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC, THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP., 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Wisdom Child Education LLC, #2 Summon(s) Sreenivas Vulli, #3 Summon(s) Mamatha Vulli) (Sigalos, George)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. (kpe)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14469480, filed by THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC, THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Wisdom Child Education LLC, #3 Summon(s) Sreenivas Vulli, #4 Summon(s) Mamatha Vulli, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10)(Sigalos, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Learning Experience Systems LLC et al v. Wisdom Child Education LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisdom Child Education LLC
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamatha Vulli
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sreenivas Vulli
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By: George Louis Sigalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE CORP.
Represented By: George Louis Sigalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?