Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fisher
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: John W. Fisher
Case Number: 0:2021cv60624
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants, nunc pro tunc, #9 the Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The Defendant's #8 answer is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Answer to Complaint by John W. Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stallings, Stephen)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by John W. Fisher. Attorney Stephen Sean Stallings added to party John W. Fisher(pty:dft). (Stallings, Stephen)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/2/2021. (jz)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alice Sum on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney Alice Sum added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla). (Sum, Alice)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. John W. Fisher waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (Levenson, Robert)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference andOrder Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John W. Fisher. (drz)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF against John W. Fisher. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Levenson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Robert Kent Levenson
Represented By: Alice Sum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?