Greenfeld v. Squidvision Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Greenfeld
Defendant: Squidvision Corp., Bobby Orbach, Kannahaus Corp., Amir Preisler, Scentcast LLC, Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Hezi Basok and Noga Solovey
Case Number: 0:2021cv60944
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/17/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Trial set for 1/2/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 12/27/2022 at 9:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2021., Expert Discovery due by 6/3/2022., Fact Discovery due by 5/6/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2021., Mediation Deadline 6/17/2022., In Limine Motions due by 11/4/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2022., Motions due by 11/4/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/2/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 25, 2021 Filing 23 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Valerie Greenfeld (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Johnson, Ahmand)
June 15, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Bobby Orbach. Attorney Daniel A. Miller added to party Bobby Orbach(pty:dft). (Miller, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Amir Preisler. Attorney Daniel A. Miller added to party Amir Preisler(pty:dft). (Miller, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Kannahaus Corp., Scentcast LLC, Squidvision Corp.. (Miller, Daniel)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS: Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/25/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valerie Greenfeld. Bobby Orbach served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Johnson, Ahmand)
June 3, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valerie Greenfeld. Amir Preisler served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Johnson, Ahmand)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Kannahaus Corp., Scentcast LLC, Squidvision Corp. (Miller, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Kannahaus Corp., Scentcast LLC, Squidvision Corp.. (Miller, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Amir Preisler. (jao)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Amir Preisler by Valerie Greenfeld (Johnson, Ahmand)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Kannahaus Corp., Scentcast LLC, Squidvision Corp. re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint (Notice of Filing Proposed Order) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion by Defendants, Squiddivision Corp., Kannahouse Corp., Ecoflame Solutions Corp., and Scentcast, LLC for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Miller, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than June 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/21/2021. (zgs)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Kannahaus Corp., Scentcast LLC, Squidvision Corp.. Attorney Daniel A. Miller added to party Ecoflame Solutions Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A. Miller added to party Kannahaus Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A. Miller added to party Scentcast LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A. Miller added to party Squidvision Corp.(pty:dft). (Miller, Daniel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valerie Greenfeld. Scentcast LLC served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Johnson, Ahmand)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valerie Greenfeld. Kannahaus Corp. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Johnson, Ahmand)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valerie Greenfeld. Ecoflame Solutions Corp. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Johnson, Ahmand)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Valerie Greenfeld. Squidvision Corp. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Johnson, Ahmand)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bobby Orbach. (pes)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Valerie Greenfeld (Johnson, Ahmand)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hezi Basok, Ecoflame Solutions Corp., Kannahaus Corp., Scentcast LLC, Noga Solovey, Squidvision Corp.. (pcs)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14655331, filed by Valerie Greenfeld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s) summons, #7 Summon(s) summons, #8 Summon(s) summons, #9 Summon(s) summons, #10 Summon(s) Summons, #11 Summon(s) summons)(Johnson, Ahmand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenfeld v. Squidvision Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Squidvision Corp.
Represented By: Daniel A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Orbach
Represented By: Daniel A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kannahaus Corp.
Represented By: Daniel A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Preisler
Represented By: Daniel A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scentcast LLC
Represented By: Daniel A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecoflame Solutions Corp.
Represented By: Daniel A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hezi Basok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noga Solovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Greenfeld
Represented By: Zhen Pan
Represented By: Michael Diaz, Jr.
Represented By: Ahmand Rashad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?