McGhee, Jr. v. Stergiou
Plaintiff: Henry McGhee, Jr.
Defendant: Nikolas Stergious and Nikolas Stergiou
Case Number: 0:2021cv61197
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nikolas Stergiou. (Gallagher, John)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Henry McGhee, Jr. re #12 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (Colon, Yvette)
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Henry McGhee, Jr. (Colon, Yvette)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Nikolas Stergiou (Gallagher, John)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Henry McGhee, Jr. (Colon, Yvette)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/19/2021. (tcl)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Henry McGhee, Jr.. Replies due by 7/26/2021. (Colon, Yvette)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Henry McGhee, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colon, Yvette)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Yvette Lisa Colon (Colon, Yvette)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nikolas Stergiou. Responses due by 7/7/2021 (Gallagher, John)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John B Gallagher on behalf of Nikolas Stergiou. Attorney John B Gallagher added to party Nikolas Stergiou(pty:dft). (Gallagher, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nikolas Stergiou. (mee)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. Modified text on 6/9/2021 (mee).
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nikolas Stergiou. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14750354, filed by Henry McGhee, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Colon, Yvette) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGhee, Jr. v. Stergiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolas Stergious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolas Stergiou
Represented By: John B Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry McGhee, Jr.
Represented By: Yvette Lisa Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?