To Your Door Medical, Inc. v. Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: To Your Door Medical, Inc.
Defendant: Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv61293
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
July 30, 2021 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Levenson, Joshua)
July 30, 2021 Filing 18 First Certificate of Other Affiliates CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSON AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by To Your Door Medical, Inc. (Thomas, Donald)
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Glove Store, Other Affiliate Amazon.com, Inc. for Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Striking #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jbs)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 STRICKEN PER de #16 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Levenson, Joshua) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (jbs).
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.. (Levenson, Joshua)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/21/2021. (cbn)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A - Proposed Order)(Levenson, Joshua)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by To Your Door Medical, Inc.. Replies due by 7/27/2021. (Thomas, Donald)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's RESPONSE In Opposition to Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Louis Hans Laurence, #2 Exhibit Department of State Division of Corporation)(Levenson, Joshua)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Louis Hans Laurence)(Levenson, Joshua)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its response by July 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/23/2021. (cbn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order)(Levenson, Joshua)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates Of Interested Parties And Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates Of Interested Parties And Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. Rule 7.1 Statement of Defendant Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14786915, filed by Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Pleadings and Orders served in State Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: State Court docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Levenson, Joshua) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified text on 6/22/2021 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: To Your Door Medical, Inc. v. Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: To Your Door Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Georgia Teresa Garnecki
Represented By: Donald J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Marketing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Royas Levenson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Buchholz
Represented By: Jason Henry Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?