R&R Yacht LLC v. ACE American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: R&R Yacht LLC
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv61415
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Respond to Initial Discovery by R&R Yacht LLC. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Russell)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#12]. It is not necessary to refile this document.Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (drz) Modified on 8/9/2021 (drz). Modified on 8/9/2021 (drz).
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Cody Lane Frank (For Image See DE#11 ) (drz)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by ACE American Insurance Company change of address, Firm and Email for Attorney, Cody L. Frank (Green, Marlin)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by ACE American Insurance Company. Replies due by 8/13/2021. (Green, Marlin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's REPLY to #5 Response/Reply (Other) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by ACE American Insurance Company. (Green, Marlin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by R&R Yacht LLC (O'Brien, Russell)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by R&R Yacht LLC (O'Brien, Russell)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by R&R Yacht LLC. Responses due by 8/6/2021 (O'Brien, Russell)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by R&R Yacht LLC. (O'Brien, Russell)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/12/2021. (eca)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14833464, filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Green, Marlin) State Court Answer filed. Modified on 7/9/2021 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&R Yacht LLC v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&R Yacht LLC
Represented By: Russell Robert O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Cody Lane Frank
Represented By: Marlin Kareem Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?