Louis v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: James Robert Louis
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Oakland Park Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office
Case Number: 0:2021cv61788
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE 9 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (pcs)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by James Robert Louis. Attorney General of the United States served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office served on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021; Oakland Park Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (See DE #8 for image). (pcs)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Robert Louis (Sandoval, Carlos)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance,. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to all applicable parties the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to all Defendants on the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to all applicable parties on the case. (pcs)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Felipe Plechac-Diaz on behalf of Attorney General of the United States, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Oakland Park Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Oakland Park Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Plechac-Diaz, Felipe)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office, Oakland Park Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security. (pcs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14956415, filed by James Robert Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Sandoval, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert Louis
Represented By: Carlos E Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Park Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?