Great Lakes Insurance SE v. Paradise Adventures LLC
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Defendant: Paradise Adventures LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv61883
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Default Final Judgment is entered against Defendant, PARADISE ADVENTURES LLC, for failure to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Great Lakes Insurance SE against Paradise Adventures LLC.; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haisfield, Melaina)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Paradise Adventures LLC. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/15/2021. (kpe)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Paradise Adventures LLC by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Haisfield, Melaina)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Great Lakes Insurance SE. Paradise Adventures LLC served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Haisfield, Melaina)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/15/2021. (eca)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melaina Diane Haisfield on behalf of Great Lakes Insurance SE. Attorney Melaina Diane Haisfield added to party Great Lakes Insurance SE(pty:pla). (Haisfield, Melaina)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paradise Adventures LLC. (kpe)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Paradise Adventures LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14989786, filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Policy)(Davant, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Insurance SE v. Paradise Adventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Represented By: Melaina Diane Haisfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Adventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?