Kapura v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Valentina Ivanovna Kapura
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Linda Swacina, Emigdio F. Martinez, Merrick Garland, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and USCIS Oakland Park, Florida field office
Case Number: 0:2021cv61992
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to USCIS to conduct an interview on the Plaintiffs Form N-336, Request for a Hearing on a Decision in Naturalization Proceedings. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. All pending hearings and deadlines are CANCELLED, and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Emigdio F. Martinez, Alejandro Mayorkas, Linda Swacina, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Oakland Park, Florida field office re #5 Unopposed MOTION to Remand of Filing Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Interview Notice) (Diaz, Natalie)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Emigdio F. Martinez, Alejandro Mayorkas, Linda Swacina, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Oakland Park, Florida field office. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Ur Mendoza Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Emigdio F. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Linda Swacina(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party USCIS Oakland Park, Florida field office(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diaz, Natalie)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valentina Ivanovna Kapura. (ebz)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND FOR HEARING ON NATURALIZATION APPLICATION against Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Emigdio F. Martinez, Alejandro Mayorkas, Linda Swacina, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Oakland Park, Florida field office. Filing fees $ 402.00 Not Paid, IFP Filed filed by Valentina Ivanovna Kapura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (ebz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapura v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Ivanovna Kapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Swacina
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emigdio F. Martinez
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Oakland Park, Florida field office
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?