MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC
Plaintiff: MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC
Case Number: 0:2021cv62149
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint or Alternatively, for a More Definitive Statement and motion to strike claims for Attorney's Fees by BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC. Responses due by 12/27/2021 (Valdes, Michelle)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #5 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. The Defendant shall respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. 1] by December 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/30/2021. (jk01)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Francisco Valdes on behalf of BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC. Attorney Manuel Francisco Valdes added to party BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC(pty:dft). (Valdes, Manuel)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Otero Valdes on behalf of BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC (Valdes, Michelle)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC. Attorney Michelle Otero Valdes added to party BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdes, Michelle)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC. (cds)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC re #1 Complaint filed by MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Moore, Michael)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15097110, filed by MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARITIME PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Moore
Represented By: Clay Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael T. Moore
Represented By: Clay Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLFISH MARINA ONE, INC
Represented By: Michelle Otero Valdes
Represented By: Manuel Francisco Valdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?