Rebecca Dickerson et al v. Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson and Charity Dickerson
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Neutrogena Corp.
Case Number: 0:2021cv62194
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. (eca)
October 22, 2021 Filing 24 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:21-cv-07230 with documents 1-21. Assigned FLSD Case Number 0:21-cv-62194-AHS Rebecca Dickerson et al v. Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. et al on 10/22/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:21-md-03015-AHS pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 23 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 22 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07230. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
October 20, 2021 Filing 21 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3015, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Raag Singhal. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
September 21, 2021 Filing 19 Summons WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Charity Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson. upon Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/15/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Steven Zalesin. (Poulin, Eric)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-05048 SB(PVCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07230 SB(PVCx). Signed by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr (rn)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Neutrogena Corp. (mrgo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson, (Poulin, Eric)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson. (Poulin, Eric)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson. correcting Summons Request #12 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #13 (Poulin, Eric)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson, (Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV added to party Charity Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV added to party Jerl Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV added to party Rebecca Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV added to party Ryan Dickerson(pty:pla))(Willey, Roy)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 filed by Plaintiff Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson. (Willey, Roy)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. See order for complete details. (jre)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blake G. Abbott. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson. (Poulin, Eric)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Charity Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson. (Poulin, Eric)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31949989 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Charity Dickerson, Ryan Dickerson, Rebecca Dickerson, Jerl Dickerson. (Attorney Eric Marc Poulin added to party Charity Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Marc Poulin added to party Jerl Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Marc Poulin added to party Rebecca Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Marc Poulin added to party Ryan Dickerson(pty:pla))(Poulin, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebecca Dickerson et al v. Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Dickerson
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Dickerson
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerl Dickerson
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Dickerson
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neutrogena Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?