Booker v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Anthony Booker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2021cv62530
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - summons issued on 01/04/2022 see de#6. (dj)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Anthony Booker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Goetz, David)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (dj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 1/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (jbs)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Booker. (jbs)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith and Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Anthony Booker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Affidavit IFP APPLICATION)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Goetz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Booker
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?