Bhogte v. Phoenix Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Devdatta Bhogte
Defendant: Phoenix Management Services, Inc. and Majestic Gardens Condominium C Association, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv62564
Filed: December 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER On Default Procedures: Phoenix Management Services, Inc. response/answer due 2/8/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see 14 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Devdatta Bhogte. Phoenix Management Services, Inc. served on 1/6/2022, response/answer due 1/27/2022. See DE #13 for image. (kpe)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Devdatta Bhogte. Phoenix Management Services, Inc. served on 1/5/2022, response/answer due 1/26/2022. (Patti, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to Show Cause by Devdatta Bhogte. (Patti, Thomas)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to File Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Dismissing Without Prejudice Majestic Gardens Condominium C Association, Inc. re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Devdatta Bhogte (Patti, Thomas)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/26/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Majestic Gardens Condominium C Association, Inc. (Van Horn, Chad)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Devdatta Bhogte (Patti, Thomas)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates of Interested Parties Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Majestic Gardens Condominium C Association, Inc., Phoenix Management Services, Inc. (pes)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the Complaint does not match the signature on the PDF document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pes)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
December 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Majestic Gardens Condominium C Association, Inc., Phoenix Management Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15273771, filed by Devdatta Bhogte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A-Collection Letter)(Hindi, Jibrael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhogte v. Phoenix Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devdatta Bhogte
Represented By: Thomas John Patti, III
Represented By: Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majestic Gardens Condominium C Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?