Orso v. Salomon
Plaintiff: Matthew Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com and Matthew E. Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Defendant: Michelet Salomon
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. and TD Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2021mc60185
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/31/2021. (Herron, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew E. Orso re #7 Writ of Garnishment on JP Morgan Chase Bank (Emery, Alison)
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew E. Orso re #7 Writ of Garnishment on Bank of America (Emery, Alison)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment AMENDED by Bank of America, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/24/2021. (Noa, Joseph)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Bank of America, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/23/2021. (Noa, Joseph)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment (Corrected) by TD Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/22/2021. (Glickman, Barry)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by TD Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 3/22/2021. (Glickman, Barry)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server.. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued in the amount of $ 6,283.25 re: #1 Registration of Foreign Judgment filed by Matthew E. Orso. (pes)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server ABC Legal by Matthew E. Orso. Responses due by 3/4/2021 (Emery, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on TD Bank by Matthew E. Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on JPMorgan Chase Bank by Matthew E. Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Bank of America by Matthew E. Orso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emery, Alison)
January 25, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (cds)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (cds)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment against Michelet Salomon. Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14278382, filed by Matthew Orso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Emery, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orso v. Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Represented By: Alison Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew E. Orso as successor trustee to Kenneth D. Bell in his capacity as court-appointed receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com
Represented By: Alison Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelet Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew R. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Noa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Barry Jay Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?