Brandenburg v. U.S. Department of State
Plaintiff: Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr.
Defendant: Secretary of State U.S. Department of State
Case Number: 0:2022cv60030
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint filed by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. (ls)
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Anthony Blinken, Secretary of State, U.S. Department of State(jc)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. U.S. Department of State served on 1/20/2022, response/answer due 3/21/2022. (ls)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OMNIBUS ORDER Plaintiff's Motion to Request Temporary Suspension of Overpayment Collection (DE #3 , #11 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program (DE #4 , #10 ) is GRANTED. This matter is referred to the Court's Volunteer Attorney Program, where a volunteer attorney may accept the representation on a pro bono basis if so desired. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (jbs) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (jbs).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons - NONE disclosed by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr (drz)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO REQUEST TEMPORARY SUSPENSION OF OVERPAYMENT COLLECTION by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. (drz)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. (drz)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/6/2022. (jhy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/6/2022. (jhy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 1/5/2022 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS100243001. (vt)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jbs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Leopoldb@aol.com (jbs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. (jbs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO REQUEST TEMPORARY SUSPENSION OF OVERPAYMENT COLLECTION by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. (jbs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State. Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(jbs) Modified text on 1/6/2022 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandenburg v. U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopold R. Brandenburg, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?