Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC v. Sirignano
Plaintiff: Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC
Defendant: Giuseppe Sirignano
Case Number: 0:2022cv60492
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Driven Brands Inc., Corporate Parent DRIVEN SYSTEMS LLC, Corporate Parent DRIVEN BRANDS FUNDNG LLC, Corporate Parent DRIVEN FUNDING HOLDCO LLC, Corporate Parent DRIVEN HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent DRIVEN BRANDS HOLDINGS INC for Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
April 29, 2022 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ebz)
April 29, 2022 Filing 18 Proposed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
April 29, 2022 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
April 29, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Driven Brands Inc., Corporate Parent Driven Brands Holding Inc., Corporate Parent DRIVEN SYSTEMS, Corporate Parent DRIVEN FUNDING HOLDCO for Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
April 29, 2022 Filing 15 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Giuseppe Sirignano identifying Other Affiliate Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A., Other Affiliate Dennis Leone, Other Affiliate Danielle Diller, Other Affiliate Shankman Leone, P.A.,, Other Affiliate Alejandro Brito for Giuseppe Sirignano (Brito, Alejandro)
April 29, 2022 Filing 14 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Giuseppe Sirignano. (Brito, Alejandro)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/29/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file his response by April 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/1/2022. (cbn)
April 1, 2022 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Giuseppe Sirignano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brito, Alejandro)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandro Brito on behalf of Giuseppe Sirignano. Attorney Alejandro Brito added to party Giuseppe Sirignano(pty:dft). (Brito, Alejandro)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice (Other). Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz)
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 STRICKEN PER DE#8 -NOTICE by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC Notice of Appearance - Danielle Diller, Esq. (Leone, Dennis) Modified on 3/28/2022 (drz).
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Danielle D. Diller, mailing date March 7, 2022, (pt)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Driven Brands Inc., Corporate Parent Driven Brands Holding Inc. for Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC (Leone, Dennis)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Giuseppe Sirignano. (jc)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15450666, filed by MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Leone, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC v. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meineke Franchisor SPV, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Dean Leone
Represented By: Danielle Diller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuseppe Sirignano
Represented By: Alejandro Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?