Bazile Medley v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Fabiola Bazile Medley
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2022cv60682
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 5/17/2022, response/answer due 7/18/2022. (ebz)
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed Kilolo Kijakazi served on 5/17/2022, response/answer due 7/18/2022. (ebz)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned to case. (jmd)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 4/21/2022, response/answer due 6/21/2022. (ebz)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance Packet prepared & placed in U.S.M. box in FTL re #6 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, filed by Fabiola Bazile Medley, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (ebz)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(ebz)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (qhq)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. (ebz)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fabiola Bazile Medley. (ebz)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) Modified Date Filed on 4/7/2022 (ebz).
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Fabiola Bazile Medley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Affidavit IFP APPLICATION)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Goetz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazile Medley v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Bazile Medley
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?