Molina v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Cecibel Molina
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Matthew Wachs
Case Number: 0:2022cv60737
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (dj)
June 7, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) with Prejudice by Cecibel Molina (Englander, Gary)
May 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Manzo, Christine)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manzo, Christine)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Stores East, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Manzo, Christine)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15560841, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Answer Filed in State Court/ No Motion to Dismiss Filed(Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court Answer and Affirmative Defense Ex. D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Manzo, Christine) Modified Text on 4/15/2022 (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecibel Molina
Represented By: Gary Brian Englander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Christine Michelle Manzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?