Thomas v. Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Thomas
Defendant: Crown Moving & Storage, Inc., Wheaton Van Lines, Inc. and Steven L Bennington
Case Number: 0:2022cv60948
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 17 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26(a)(1) by Steven L Bennington, Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. (Beckham, Eugene)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Jeff Thomas (Stulz, Travis)
June 24, 2022 Filing 15 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26(a)(1) by Jeff Thomas (Stulz, Travis)
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeff Thomas identifying Corporate Parent Radiology Physician Solutions of Florida, LLC., Corporate Parent Alliance Spine & Joint III, Inc., Corporate Parent Associates MD Medical Group, Corporate Parent ProMed Anesthesia, Corporate Parent Aventura Surgery Center, Corporate Parent Beaches MRI, Corporate Parent Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. f/k/a Wheaton Van Lines, Corporate Parent rainbow moving & storage, Corporate Parent Akumin - Plantation Gardens, Corporate Parent Chirocare of Florida, Corporate Parent Comprehensive MD, Corporate Parent Deefield Beach Outpatient Surgical Center, Corporate Parent Del Risco & Associates Anesthesia Services, Corporate Parent Hoffman Park Emergency Physicians LLC, Corporate Parent Neurocity Junction, Corporate Parent SurgiClear, Corporate Parent Plantation General Hospital, Corporate Parent Protective Insurance Company, Corporate Parent United Healthcare for Jeff Thomas (Stulz, Travis)
June 16, 2022 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Steven L Bennington, Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. (Beckham, Eugene)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Substitute Party and File an Amended Complaint by Jeff Thomas. Responses due by 6/28/2022 (Stulz, Travis)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION to Strike #7 First MOTION to Strike by Crown Moving & Storage, Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Beckham, Eugene)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Answer to Complaint. Missing Filer Name(s); ERROR - The filer failed to select all parties indicated. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crown Moving & Storage, Inc., Steven L Bennington (Beckham, Eugene) Modified Filers on 5/31/2022 (cds).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/24/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION to Strike by Crown Moving & Storage, Inc.. Responses due by 6/7/2022 (Beckham, Eugene)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. (Beckham, Eugene)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Consent to Removal. Attorney Eugene Goff Beckham added to party Crown Moving & Storage, Inc.(pty:dft). (Beckham, Eugene)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Steven L Bennington re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Beckham, Eugene)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15648973, filed by Steven L Bennington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Beckham, Eugene) Modified Text on 5/18/2022 (cds). Answer Filed (Exh.#3)/No Motion to Dismiss Field

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Crown Moving & Storage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Moving & Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Goff Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheaton Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Goff Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L Bennington
Represented By: Eugene Goff Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Thomas
Represented By: Travis J. Stulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?