Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. v. CitiBank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: CitiBank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2022cv61050
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document CitiBank, N.A.. Response/Answer due 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/11/2022. (agy)
July 8, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by CitiBank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. (Hueber, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Responses due by 7/11/2022 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/27/2022. (agy)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document CitiBank, N.A.. Response/Answer due 7/11/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/27/2022. (agy)
June 27, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by CitiBank, N.A.. Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party CitiBank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barton, Ana)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by CitiBank, N.A.. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party CitiBank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.. CitiBank, N.A. served on 6/6/2022, response/answer due 6/27/2022. (ls)(See Image at DE #5 )
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint (Hueber, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Singh Declaration, #2 Affidavit Sejour Declaration)(Hueber, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CitiBank, N.A. (mab)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CitiBank, N.A.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15687695, filed by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hueber, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. v. CitiBank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Olivia Hueber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank, N.A.
Represented By: Ana Maria Barton
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?