Tucker v. Blackfisk Marine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Tucker
Defendant: Blackfisk Marine, LLC and Jean Traynor
Case Number: 0:2022cv61953
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
Referring Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Replevin & Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: A Status Conference is set in this matter on Wednesday, December 21, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before United States Magistrate Judge Augustin-Birch, to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference, to discuss the Issue of Representation referred to the Magistrate Judge on December 13, 2022. See #37 . To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 9651 8849 and Passcode: 752819. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Counsel should come prepared to discuss their availability and the availability of any witnesses counsel intends to call, should the Court schedule an evidentiary hearing on the issue of representation. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 12/14/2022. (mw01)
December 14, 2022 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/21/2022 10:00 AM via Zoom Video Teleconference in Fort Lauderdale Division before US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. (ls)(per DE #39)
December 13, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE by Vincent Tucker re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Filing Exhibit A (Shilling, Cody)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO STAY AND ISSUE OF REPRESENTATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ORDER REFERRING #30 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Pending Outcome of Blackfisk Marine, L.L.C. Which is Pending in State Court filed by Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. Motions referred to Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Pending Outcome of Blackfisk Marine, L.L.C. Which is Pending in State Court filed by Vincent Tucker. Replies due by 12/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (State Court Complaint))(Shilling, Cody)
December 12, 2022 Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Blackfisk Marine, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2022 (Olive, Benjamin)
December 9, 2022 Filing 34 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Failure to Join Indispensable Party filed by Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. (Attachments: #1 Third DCA Order Striking Brief Because It Contained Personal Attacks)(Kleppin, Chris)
December 8, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Replevin filed by Vincent Tucker. (Shilling, Cody)
December 7, 2022 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT to 29 Order to Show Cause,,, by Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor (Kleppin, Chris)
December 7, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #23 Order, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings by Jean Traynor, Blackfisk Marine, LLC. (Kleppin, Chris)
December 7, 2022 Filing 30 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Pending Outcome of Blackfisk Marine, L.L.C. Which is Pending in State Court by Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. Responses due by 12/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 State Court Lawsuit, #2 Notice of Lis Pendens in State Court)(Kleppin, Chris)
December 6, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Replevin. Responses due by 12/7/2022 (ls)(per DE #29)
December 6, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Replevin. Replies due by 12/9/2022. (ls)(per DE #29)
December 6, 2022 Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court entered its Order Requiring Parties' Conferral and Setting Briefing Schedule #23 ordering all Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Replevin Order to Show Cause #12 by December 5, 2022. All Defendants have not filed a response to date. By no later than December 7, 2022 at 3:00 p.m., all non-responding Defendants shall show cause, in writing, why they have failed to comply with the Court's Order. By December 7, 2022 at 3:00 p.m., all non-responding Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Replevin Order to Show Cause #12 . Plaintiff's reply to any responses is now due by Friday, December 9, 2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 12/6/2022. (mw01)
December 5, 2022 Filing 28 Defendant's RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Replevin by Blackfisk Marine, LLC. (Olive, Benjamin)
December 2, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Failure to Join Indispensable Party filed by Vincent Tucker. Replies due by 12/9/2022. (Shilling, Cody)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on #25 Response to Order to Show Cause, construed as a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Motion to Dismiss. Reset Deadlines as to #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Failure to Join Indispensable Party. (Responses due by 12/2/2022). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 1, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #24 Order to Show Cause, by Vincent Tucker. (Shilling, Cody)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the #21 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Failure to Join Indispensable Party should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES CONFERRAL AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 11/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (mw01)
November 16, 2022 Filing 22 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Status Conference held on 11/16/2022. Total time in court: 16 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Benjamin Eric Olive, Chris Kleppin, Cody Jordan Shilling. (mw01)
November 16, 2022 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Failure to Join Indispensable Party ( Responses due by 11/30/2022) by Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in Traynor v. LoRusso, Case No. 22-016106 (18), #2 Email from Process Server that LoRusso Claimed to Have Run Off to Alaska Never to Return)(Kleppin, Chris)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Denying #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denying #18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Blackfisk Marine, LLC. Response/Answer due 12/12/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Failure to Join Indispensable Party ( Responses due by 11/29/2022) by Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Blackfisk Marine, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Jean Traynor(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Complaint in Traynor v. LoRusso, Case No. 22-016106 (18), #2 Email from Process Server that LoRusso Claimed to Have Run Off to Alaska Never to Return)(Kleppin, Chris)
November 15, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Blackfisk Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Olive, Benjamin)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: A Status Conference is set in this matter on November 16, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before United States Magistrate Judge Augustin-Birch, to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 9651 8849 and Passcode: 752819. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 11/14/2022. (mw01)
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Eric Olive on behalf of Blackfisk Marine, LLC. Attorney Benjamin Eric Olive added to party Blackfisk Marine, LLC(pty:dft). (Olive, Benjamin)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Replevin filed by Vincent Tucker. Motions referred to Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 26, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Vincent Tucker. Jean Traynor served on 10/25/2022, response/answer due 11/15/2022. (Shilling, Cody)
October 26, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Replevin by Vincent Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Note, Security Agreement, List of Boats)(Shilling, Cody)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Vincent Tucker re #1 Complaint, of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - LOI, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - List of Boats, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Redacted Wire Transfer, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Certificates of Origin, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - UCC Filings) (Shilling, Cody)
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Vincent Tucker. Blackfisk Marine, LLC served on 10/25/2022, response/answer due 11/15/2022. (Shilling, Cody)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelsey K Black on behalf of Vincent Tucker (Black, Kelsey)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Re-issued as to Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. (pes)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to Show Cause by Vincent Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sunbiz Filings)(Shilling, Cody)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blackfisk Marine, LLC, Jean Traynor. (nan)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Vincent Tucker re #1 Complaint, filed by Vincent Tucker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons - Traynor 1, #2 Summon(s) Summons - Traynor 2, #3 Summon(s) Summons - Blackfisk Marine) (Shilling, Cody)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) Modified on 10/21/2022 (nan).
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16040238, filed by Vincent Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons Traynor 1, #3 Summon(s) Summons Traynor 2, #4 Summon(s) Summons Blackfisk)(Shilling, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Blackfisk Marine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Tucker
Represented By: Cody Jordan Shilling
Represented By: Kelsey K Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackfisk Marine, LLC
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Olive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Traynor
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?