Cohan v. Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc. a Florida Profit Corporation doing business as Dunkin Donuts/Baskin Robbins
Case Number: 0:2022cv62251
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/25/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 25, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Aside Clerk's Default: granting #11 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc. (Ershock, Alex)
January 10, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default by Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc.. Attorney Alex Brandon Claude Ershock added to party Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Ershock, Alex)
January 10, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #9 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, #8 Administrative Order. (Default mailed to LORD SHEBA INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.) (drz)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 VACATED Per DE #13 Clerk's Entry of Default as to LORD SHEBA INVESTMENT GROUP, INC. per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #8 Administrative Order. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/10/2023. (drz) Modified text on 1/11/2023 (pc)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/9/2023. See attached document for full details. (zse)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Regarding Plaintiff's Visits to the Property signed by: Howard Cohan by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 Plaintiff's RESPONSE To Court Order Requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sconzo, Gregory)
December 14, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc. served on 12/13/2022, response/answer due 1/3/2023. (Sconzo, Gregory)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc. (rbe)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16141320, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Samantha Lyn Simpson
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord Sheba Investment Group, Inc. a Florida Profit Corporation doing business as Dunkin Donuts/Baskin Robbins
Represented By: Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?