Davis v. Pierre
Plaintiff: James Davis
Defendant: Romario Pierre
Case Number: 0:2022cv62252
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP [ECF No. #6 ] is GRANTED to the exten that Plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of this Court as funds become available. The jail/prison having custody of Plaintiff must make payments from the prisoner's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (daa)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Davis. (ebz)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. #1 ] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before January 13, 2023, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. This case is CLOSED for administrative purposes only. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) form) (daa)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before January 13, 2023, Plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee or renew his IFP motion and attach a certified copy of his prison/jail account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide the short-form IFP motion form to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (daa)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Davis. (daa)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (daa)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Romario Pierre. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by James Davis.(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romario Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?