Emrit v. Jules
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Sabine Aisha Jules
Case Number: 0:2023cv60014
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Miscellaneous Documents by Ronald Satish Emrit. (apz)
February 23, 2023 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM (incomplete form, missing page #2) by Ronald Satish Emrit re #6 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (apz)
February 9, 2023 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Date received by USCA: 2/8/2023. USCA Case Number: 23-10415-B. (apz)
February 9, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to Ronald Satish Emrit re #6 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
February 8, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appeal re #5 Order Dismissing/Closing Case by Ronald Satish Emrit. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (apz)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
January 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Interlocutory Appeal by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Document cannot be transmitted to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals because there is no order to appeal at this moment.) (apz)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (amb)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sabine Aisha Jules. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(amb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2023: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabine Aisha Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?