Time Out, LLC v. Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Time Out, LLC
Defendant: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2023cv61946
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 0635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shayna Krystal Hudson on behalf of Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Attorney Shayna Krystal Hudson added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft). (Hudson, Shayna)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Stuart Davant on behalf of Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Attorney Charles Stuart Davant added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft). (Davant, Charles)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company waiver sent on 10/19/2023, response/answer due 12/18/2023. (Davant, Charles)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (rbe)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16986752, filed by Time Out, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Marine Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Fiorilli, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Time Out, LLC v. Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Time Out, LLC
Represented By: Justin Scott Fiorilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Represented By: Shayna Krystal Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?