Campbell v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lindon G. Campbell
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2024cv62181
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Redaction. ECF No. #10 . Plaintiff requests redaction of the full account number set forth on various pages of a transcript filed on November 18, 2024. However, according to the docket, there is no transcript filed in this action. Further, the Motion does not comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 because it includes the full account number rather than the last four digits. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to SEAL Plaintiff's Motion for Redaction, ECF NO. #10 , and the Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 1/6/2025. (nsy)
December 30, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Wendy Suzanne Griffith re #5 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
December 26, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT by Lindon G. Campbell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (nan)
December 26, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION Redaction Request by Lindon G. Campbell. (nan)
December 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF AMENDMENT by Lindon G. Campbell re #8 Amended Complaint. (scn)
December 23, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed by Lindon G. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(scn)
December 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation and County Park Condominium Association by Lindon G. Campbell. (scn)
December 12, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Wendy Suzanne Griffith re #5 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Wendy Suzanne Griffith has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Notice of Change of Address. by Wendy Suzanne Griffith (Griffith, Wendy)
December 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wendy Suzanne Griffith on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Attorney Wendy Suzanne Griffith added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft). (Griffith, Wendy)
November 18, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lindon G. Campbell. (amb)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Country Park Condominiums, Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, HSBL Mortgage Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Lindon G. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Suzanne Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindon G. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?