PAN v. GE
Plaintiff: XUFANG PAN
Defendant: HUI YANG GE
Case Number: 0:2025cv60118
Filed: January 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David S Leibowitz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in re: Service of summons and complaint. Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 APPENDIX to #1 Complaint by XUFANG PAN (Zhou, June (Hua))
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HUI YANG GE. (cwc)
January 19, 2025 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
January 19, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Xufang PAN against HUI YANG GE. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18130823, filed by XUFANG PAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Zhou, June (Hua))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAN v. GE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XUFANG PAN
Represented By: June (Hua) Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUI YANG GE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?