Global Franchise Investors Limited et al v. 2243597 Alberta Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED and GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC
Defendant: 2243597 ALBERTA LTD., 1640339 ALBERTA LTD., 3279956 NOVA SCOTIA LIMITED and 3321216 NOVA SCOTIA LIMITED
Case Number: 0:2025cv60284
Filed: February 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David S Leibowitz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than April 28, 2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
April 7, 2025 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE #13 ORDER: 1640339 Alberta Ltd. response/answer due 4/28/2025; 2243597 Alberta Ltd. response/answer due 4/28/2025; 3279956 Nova Scotia Limited response/answer due 4/28/2025; 3321216 Nova Scotia Limited response/answer due 4/28/2025. (caw) Modified on 4/7/2025 (caw).
April 4, 2025 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time April 28, 2025 re #1 Complaint by 2243597 Alberta Ltd., 1640339 Alberta Ltd., 3279956 Nova Scotia Limited, 3321216 Nova Scotia Limited. Attorney Aliette DelPozo Rodz added to party 2243597 Alberta Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Aliette DelPozo Rodz added to party 1640339 Alberta Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Aliette DelPozo Rodz added to party 3279956 Nova Scotia Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Aliette DelPozo Rodz added to party 3321216 Nova Scotia Limited(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/18/2025. (Rodz, Aliette)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Brett M. Buterick. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz (dsf)
February 20, 2025 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 1640339 ALBERTA LTD., 2243597 ALBERTA LTD., 3279956 NOVA SCOTIA LIMITED, and 3321216 NOVA SCOTIA LIMITED. (caw)
February 20, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brett M. Buterick. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18220174 by GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED, GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2025. (Wasch, Adam)
February 19, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED, GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC re #1 Complaint filed by GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED, GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s)) (Wasch, Adam)
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED, GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC re #1 Complaint (Wasch, Adam)
February 18, 2025 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Brett M. Buterick, mailing date February 18, 2025, (pt)
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (caw)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (caw)
February 17, 2025 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
February 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18209630, filed by GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED, GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC.(Wasch, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Franchise Investors Limited et al v. 2243597 Alberta Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLOBAL FRANCHISE INVESTORS LIMITED
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Brett M. Buterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLOBAL FRANCHISE OPPORTUNITIES, LLC
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Brett M. Buterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2243597 ALBERTA LTD.
Represented By: Aliette DelPozo Rodz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1640339 ALBERTA LTD.
Represented By: Aliette DelPozo Rodz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3279956 NOVA SCOTIA LIMITED
Represented By: Aliette DelPozo Rodz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3321216 NOVA SCOTIA LIMITED
Represented By: Aliette DelPozo Rodz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?