Allapattah Services, et al v. Exxon Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Allapattah Services, Incorporated, Robert Lewis, Inc., John Pinder, Lee-Langley Corp., Martin I. Cook, David Wise, Willston Center Autocare, Incorporated, Rylyns Enterprises, Incorporated, Paul Bove, William McGillicuddy, Russel Cline, G.G.S.K., Inc, G.G.S.K.1, Inc., William R. Hilton, Richard P. Durishin, George Dalton, Ted's Car Care Center, Inc., Deener, Stern & Hirsch, Steven D. Slack and Claimant
Defendant: Exxon Corporation, Nikki Logan, James R Walsh, Thomas E. Scott, Claimant, Allied Esquire Group, Inc. and Boyd Thatcher
Respondent: Federal Refund, Inc.
Special_master: Theodore Klein and Thomas E. Scott
Movant: Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A., Pertnoy, Solowsky & Allen, P.A., Gerald M. Bowen, McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP, Radha Ramana Narumanchi, Rocco DeLeonardis, Todd Thatcher and Gainey & McKenna
Claimant: Pamela Elizabeth Chomko, Gary A. Clark, Bahman Natanzi, Daniel S. Pawlowski, Douglas R. Smith, Argiro Sourvanos, Carter Ann Rollins, Helen P. Marsellas, Dominic Gentilcore, Bob L. Howell, Bernard Schwarz, D. Richard Shortridge, Judy Ann Edwards, Leonard Gerome, Geeta Suresh Arurkar, Cecelia Tormos, Rose Dewar, Marie Walker, Kirk Hall, Hiram Carson Lewis, Jr., Larry R. Freeland, James Vierschilling, Josephine Choi, Wendell P. Burley, Steven W. Taylor, Sung Pal Min, Tung H. Choi, Hilda A. Jones, Betty Sue Dick, Joseph F. Ferris, Benjamin Skelton, Albert Aguera Gil, Terry Sothmann, Anton E. Zeit, Ethel Mae Glover, Harmon David Arrowood, Jimmie Walley, George Ratcliff, So Uey Lee, James Forester, Class Counsel, Joseph Gibson, Johnny Vourazeris, Sea Breeze Investments, Inc., James A. Edmonds, Jr., Stone Street Capital, Inc., Walter A. Smith, III, Anastasia Diamantaras, Van Diamantaras, Eog Man Kang, Estate of Jonathan C. Dean, Larry Allen Kane, Miriam Nieto, Stylianos Bouboudakis, Maxine Rosson, Glenna Oliver and Betty Murphy
Consol_plaintiff: The Garden City Group, Inc., Carlos Alberto Deburman, Joseph Lerman, Randal Mackay, Betty L. Sisk, David W. Murray and Rylyns Enterprise
Trustee: Robert L. Johns
Intervenor: Allied Esquire Group, Inc. and Alisa Lachow-Thurston
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Eldersburg Service Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:1991cv00986
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Alan S. Gold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6142 ORDER requiring Verification by the Garden City Group, Inc. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 2/8/2011. (ts)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6078 *ORDER on Class Counsel's Final Notice of Failure to Seek Payments. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 12/6/10. (ts)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6072 AMENDED ORDER on Class Counsel's Notice regarding Claimaints who have Failed to Cash Checks. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 8/9/2010. (ts)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6071 ADMINISTRATIVE PAYMENT ORDER 26; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 6070 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 8/2/2010. (ail)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6068 ORDER on Class Counsel's Notice regarding Claimants who have Failed to Cash Checks. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 7/28/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ts)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6059 PAYMENT ORDER 586; ORDER adopting and affirming 6057 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 7/12/2010. (ral)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6051 ORDER regarding Class Counsel's Notice of Failure to Seek Payment of 5% Reserve. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 6/2/10. (ts)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6016 ORDER on Motion 135. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 4/9/2010. (ts)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6012 PAYMENT ORDER 181; ORDER granting 5990 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 6011 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 3/31/2010. (tb)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5989 ORDER regarding Claimants who have Failed to Seek Payment as Identified in Class Counsel's Third Notice. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 2/22/2010. (ts)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5906 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 5876 Report and Recommendations. Any direct claim made by Robert Edgar Fletcher is Denied as both untimely and insufficiently substantiated. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 1/5/2010. (ail)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5865 ORDER REGARDING DISPUTED CLAIM D4.5 (CLAIM #1016536C). Signed by Thomas E. Scott, Special Master on 11/19/2009. (ts)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5860 Special Master's Supplemental Response in Accordance with the District Court's Order [D.E. 5818]. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 11/18/2009. (ts)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5838 ORDER on Motion 132. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 11/5/09. (ts)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5833 ORDER to Show Cause Against Claimant Joseph N. John, Claim No. 1001976. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 11/4/09. (ts)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5777 ORDER Reinstating Entitlement to 5% Reserve on Claim 1657. Signed by Thomas E. Scott Special Master on 8/19/2009. (ts)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5759 ORDER Granting Motion by Allied Esquire Group, Inc. Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 7/29/2009.(ts)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5753 ORDER Setting Hearing on the Five Percent Reserve, Disposition of the Forfeited Fees and Incentive Award, and Related Issues Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 7/27/2009.(ts)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5749 ORDER Following Hearing of July 20, 2009 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 7/21/2009.Re: 5747 Amended Order. (ts)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5747 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Hearing on Pending Motions and Issues Concerning Gerald M. Bowen's Fee Award and Related Matters Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 7/15/2009.(ts)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5739 AMENDED ORDER Regarding Disputed Claim D4.9 (Claim Number 2555) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 6/30/2009.(ts)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5738 ORDER Regarding Disputed Claim D4.9 (Claim Number 2555) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 6/26/2009.(ts)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5734 ORDER Regarding Request for Position Papers Regarding the Five Percent Reserve and Related Issues Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 6/23/2009(ts)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5729 ORDER on Motion 130 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 6/19/2009.(ts)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5725 ADMINISTRATIVE Payment Order 19; ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 5722 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 6/15/2009. (tas)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5722 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Entry of an Administrative Payment Order to Pay the Administrative Expenses of the Settlement Fund Signed by the Special MasterThomas E. Scott on 6/11/2009.Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2009.(ts)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5721 ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply by Third Party, Allied Esquire, To D. Campbell's Opposition to Enforcement of Allied's Claim for Payment D.E. 5707 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 6/10/2009.(ts)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5718 ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C11.6 Signed by the Special MasterThomas E. Scott on 5/28/2009.Re: 5216 MOTION Class Counsel's Eleventh Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C11) filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5716 FINAL ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C10.7 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 5/26/2009.(ts)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5699 ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C7.18 Signed by the Special MasterThomas E. Scott on 5/4/2009.(ts)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5696 CORRECTED ORDER Resetting Hearing on Pending Motions and Issues Concerning Gerald M. Bowen's Fee Award and Related Matters Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 4/29/2009. (ts)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5690 ORDER Regarding Non-Responsive Claimants Included in Notice NR1 (Five Percent Reserve) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 4/27/2009.(ts)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5683 ORDER Setting Additional Hearing Relating to Claim Number 457 and Susan Patton and Jeffrey Scott Patton Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 4/22/2009.(ts)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5674 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Susan Patton and Jeffrey Scott Patton (Claim Number 457) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 4/9/2009.(ts)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5671 ORDER Setting Hearing on Pending Motions and Issues Concerning Gerald M. Bowen's Fee Award and Related Matters Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 4/8/2009.(ts)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5658 ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C10.1. Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 3/25/2009.Re: 4909 MOTION -Class Counsel's Tenth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C10)- filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5643 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Authorization to Distribute Five Percent Reserve and Interest Signed by the Special MasterThomas E. Scott on 3/16/2009.(ts)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5632 OMNIBUS ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re 5478 Report and Recommendationsdenying 5415 for Immediate Disbursement of Reimbursment for Costs to Trust Account of T.J. McKenna for First Lien Holder Allied Esquire Capital by Gerald M. Bowen.; Denying 5527 Motion to Enforce Security Interest in Gerald Bowen's Award of Fees and Costs by Jewel Humphrey Grutman. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 3/11/2009. (ail)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5625 ORDER Resetting Briefing Schedule on Issue of Proper Disposition of the Partially Forfeited Fees of Gerald M. Bowen and Forfeited Incentive Award of William McGillicuddy, Referred to the Special Master signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 2/27/2009.Re: 5541 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (ts)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5621 ORDER Regarding Disputed Claim D4.15 (Claim Number 2486A) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 2/25/2009.(ts)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5616 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Issue of Proper Disposition of the Partially Forfeited Fees of Gerald M. Bowen and Forfeited Incentive Award of William McGillicuddy, Referred to the Special Master Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 2/24/2009. (ts)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5610 ORDER on Motion 129th Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 2/17/2009.(ts)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5606 ORDER Reinstating Previously Dismissed Claim Number 4470 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 2/13/2009.Re: 5587 Order. (ts)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5589 Sua Sponte REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Entry of Order for Disbursement of Funds for Payment of United States Backup Withholding from Awards Contained in the Twelfth Wave of Payments form the Settlement Fund Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 2/4/2009.(Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2009).(ts)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5565 ORDER Resetting Hearing to Adjudicate Claimant Dispute C9.5a&b Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 1/26/2009.Re: 4611 MOTION Class Counsel's Ninth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C9) filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5556 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule of Pending Appeals Referred to the Special Master by Honorable Alan S. Gold Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 1/22/2009. Re: 5529 Order Referring Case to Special Master. (ts)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5547 ORDER Regarding Claimants Who Have Failed to Seek Payment as Identified in Class Counsel's Second Notice Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scotton 1/12/2009.(ts)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5521 OMNIBUS ORDER Regarding Stern's Weaver's Petition, granting 5342 Motion for Disbursement of Funds ; denying Objections to 5391 Report and Recommendation and 5392 Motion for Sanctions; adopting Report and Recommendations re 5466 Repor t and Recommendations and DENYING 5483 Objections to Report and Recommendation, the court approves distribution of attorney's fees to Sterns Weaver in the amount of $30,911,194.50 (see order for distribution requirements).. Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/7/2008. (cqs)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5493 ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C9.8 Signed by the Special MasterThomas E. Scott on 12/9/2008.Re: 4611 MOTION Class Counsel's Ninth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C9) filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5487 ORDER Regarding Non-Responsive Claimants Included in Notice N14 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 12/8/2008.(ts)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5478 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Regarding Gerald M. Bowen's Request for Cost Reimbursement Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 12/3/2008.Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. (ts)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5475 ORDER Resetting Hearing for Disputed Claims D4.11 & D4.12 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 12/2/2008.(ts)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5465 ORDER Setting Hearings Concerning Unsettled Claimant Disputes in Class Counsel's Eleventh Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C11)Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 11/25/2008.(ts)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5460 AMENDED ORDER Regarding Class Counsel's Second Amended Fourth Motion for Adjudication of Disputed Claims (Motion D4) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 11/21/2008.(ts)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5459 ORDER Regarding Class Counsel's Second Amended Fourth Motion for Adjudication of Disputed Claims (Motion D4) Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 11/21/2008.(ts)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5456 ORDER to Show Cause Against Claimant Thomas J. Terry, Jr., Claim Number 100711B, and Claimant Tom Terry Enterprises, Inc., Claim Number 1019738B Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 11/19/2008.(ts)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5430 ORDER to Show Cause Against Claimant Michael J. Triaga, Claim No. 100522C Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 11/10/2008. Re: 5429 Notice (Other) filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5427 SUA SPONTE ORDER on Claimants Who Have Failed to Seek Payment Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 11/5/2008. (ts)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5358 Sua Sponte ORDER Following October 17, 2008 Hearing on all Pending Motions Filed by Gerald M. Bowen and/or Law Office of Gerald M. Bowen, Requesting all Interested Parties to Provide Memoranda of Law and Position Papers Signed by the Special Master Thoams E. Scott on 10/17/2008. (ts)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5346 Sua Sponte ORDER Cancelling Hearing on Claimant Dispute C10.4 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 10/16/2008. (ts)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5330 ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C10.5 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 10/8/2008. Re: 4909 MOTION -Class Counsel's Tenth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C10)- filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5324 ORDER Setting Hearing on all Pending Motions Filed by Gerald Bowen and/or Law Office of Gerald M. Bowen Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 10/7/2008. (ts)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5317 ORDER Regarding Non-Responsive Claimants Included in Notice N13 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 10/1/2008. (ts)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5276 ORDER Regarding Conflicting Claimant Dispute C6.6 Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 9/10/2008. Re: 4128 MOTION - Sixth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C6) filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5266 ORDER Regarding Non-Responsive Claimants Included in Notice N12 Signed by Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 9/9/2008. (ts)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5257 ORDER Resetting Hearings Concerning Unsettled Claimant Disputes in Class Counsel's Tenth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C10)Signed by the Special Master Thomas E. Scott on 9/5/2008. Re: 4909 MOTION -Class Counsel's Tenth Motion for Adjudication of Conflicting Claims (Motion C10)- filed by Class Counsel. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allapattah Services, et al v. Exxon Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allapattah Services, Incorporated
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pinder
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee-Langley Corp.
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin I. Cook
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wise
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willston Center Autocare, Incorporated
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rylyns Enterprises, Incorporated
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bove
Represented By: Graeme W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McGillicuddy
Represented By: Graeme W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Cline
Represented By: Russel A. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.G.S.K., Inc
Represented By: Graeme W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.G.S.K.1, Inc.
Represented By: Graeme W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Hilton
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Durishin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Dalton
Represented By: Graeme W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted's Car Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Andre Shramenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deener, Stern & Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claimant
Represented By: Cecilia Duran Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Corporation
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claimant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Esquire Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Fletcher Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Thatcher
Represented By: David H. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Theodore Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Thomas E. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Refund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
Represented By: Mona Mitrani Markus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Pertnoy, Solowsky & Allen, P.A.
Represented By: Suyash Agrawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gerald M. Bowen
Represented By: Gerald M. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Radha Ramana Narumanchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Rocco DeLeonardis
Represented By: Michelle Anne McClaskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Todd Thatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gainey & McKenna
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pamela Elizabeth Chomko
Represented By: Norman Aaron Fleisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary A. Clark
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bahman Natanzi
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel S. Pawlowski
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Douglas R. Smith
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Argiro Sourvanos
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carter Ann Rollins
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Helen P. Marsellas
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dominic Gentilcore
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bob L. Howell
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bernard Schwarz
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: D. Richard Shortridge
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Judy Ann Edwards
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leonard Gerome
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Geeta Suresh Arurkar
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cecelia Tormos
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rose Dewar
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie Walker
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kirk Hall
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hiram Carson Lewis, Jr.
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Larry R. Freeland
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Vierschilling
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Josephine Choi
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wendell P. Burley
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven W. Taylor
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sung Pal Min
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tung H. Choi
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hilda A. Jones
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Betty Sue Dick
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph F. Ferris
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Benjamin Skelton
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Albert Aguera Gil
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terry Sothmann
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anton E. Zeit
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ethel Mae Glover
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Harmon David Arrowood
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jimmie Walley
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Ratcliff
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: So Uey Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Class Counsel
Represented By: Mona Mitrani Markus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph Gibson
Represented By: Ted Christopher Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnny Vourazeris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sea Breeze Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James A. Edmonds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stone Street Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Walter A. Smith, III
Represented By: David M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anastasia Diamantaras
Represented By: Andrew M. Grimland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Van Diamantaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eog Man Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Jonathan C. Dean
Represented By: Jerry William Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Larry Allen Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Miriam Nieto
Represented By: Richard John Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stylianos Bouboudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maxine Rosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Glenna Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Betty Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: The Garden City Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Patrick Dikeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Carlos Alberto Deburman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Joseph Lerman
Represented By: Karen Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Randal Mackay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Betty L. Sisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: David W. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Rylyns Enterprise
Represented By: Cynthia Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert L. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Allied Esquire Group, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Mariani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alisa Lachow-Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Eldersburg Service Center, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?