Sabatier v. Suntrust Bank
Case Number: 1:2006cv20418
Filed: February 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: William J. Zloch
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER directing Parties to file Memorandum re: fees and costs by Noon, 8/14/2009. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/11/2009. (bc)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Fed. R.Civ. P. 60(b)(6) Relief, Disqualification and denying as moot 81 Motion for Fed. R.Civ. P. 60(b)(6) Relief, Disqualification. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/7/2009. (bc)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/5/2009. (bc)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER striking Judges Moreno and Zloch from Plaintiff's Witness List. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 6/22/2009. (RSR)
June 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER regarding evidentiary hearing set for 6/24/09. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 6/21/2009. (RSR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabatier v. Suntrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?