CC-Aventura, Inc., et al v. Weitz Company, LLC, et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv21598
Filed: June 22, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Paul C. Huck
Presiding Judge: Andrea M. Simonton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2243 ORDER on Informal Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/29/2010. (tro)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2215 ORDER granting 2154 Motion for Summary Judgment by Tremco Incorporated. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/10/2010. (eg)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2181 ORDER adopting 2166 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/2/2010. (eg)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2048 ORDER granting Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/9/2009. (mgz)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1970 ORDER on Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Aero-Trane Contract Documents. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/21/2009. (mgz)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1906 ORDER re 1652 Renewed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment against Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Aero Cooling Services, Inc., filed by American Standard d/b/a Trane, and ORDER Setting Status Conference:( Status Conference set for 7/17/2009 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Paul C. Huck.). Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 7/13/2009. (mgz)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1903 ORDER denying 1699 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 1699 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 7/13/2009. (adr)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1781 ORDER on informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/18/2009. (lc3)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 ORDER denying 1509 the Motion of Third Party Defendant, Concrete & Lumber Enterprises Corporation, for Partial Summary Judgment Against Third Party Plaintiff, The Weitz Company, LLC, Regarding its Claim for Indemnity for Consequential Damages Other than Delay. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/30/2009. (lc3)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER and Notice of Hearing as to In Camera Inspection in accordance with the Order entered by Judge Huck at DE # 1501. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 12/9/2008. (lc4)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1320 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 1417 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/4/2008. (lc3)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1320 Third Party MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff's Claim for Attorney's Fees filed by Concrete & Lumber Enterprises Corp. Recommending that the motion be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 10/27/2008. (lc3)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 ORDER granting 1277 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 9/15/2008. (lc3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CC-Aventura, Inc., et al v. Weitz Company, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?