Maria et al v. Apple Computer, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that defendant Apple Computer, Inc. subjected plaintiffs to identity theft and credit card fraud by printing more than the last five digits of plaintiffs' credit or debit card numbers on receipts at the point of sale.

Plaintiff: Angely Maria and Todd Narson
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv22040
Filed: August 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Adalberto Jordan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2007 Filing 16
Agreed Amended MOTION for Limited Appearance of Mark T. Cramer, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #969800. (cw)
October 31, 2007 Filing 13
NOTICE of Change of Address by Janet T. Munn (Munn, Janet)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark T. Cramer;Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/29/2007. (bs)
October 26, 2007 Filing 10
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Margaret Kennedy on behalf of all plaintiffs (Kennedy, Patricia)
October 25, 2007 Filing 9
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/8/2007.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/25/2007.(bs)
October 24, 2007 Filing 8
Agreed MOTION for Mark T. Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #968969. (cw)
October 22, 2007 Filing 6
Defendant Apple Computer, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Apple Computer, Inc..(Munn, Janet)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Response to the Complaint; Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 09/21/2007. (bs)
August 8, 2007 Filing 2
Summons Issued as to Apple Computer, Inc.. (ail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria et al v. Apple Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angely Maria
Represented By: Matthew S. Sarelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Narson
Represented By: Matthew S. Sarelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Janet T. Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?