Lanson v. Cohen
Plaintiff: Meryl Lanson
Defendant: Jeri Beth Cohen
Case Number: 1:2008cv22009
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Seitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: no cause specified

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER certification of transfer to Magistrate Judge McAliley. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/18/2009. (lc3)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 MOTION to Vacate 6 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Meryl Lanson. Order of Dismissal is Vacated and Ms. Lanson shall file her response by 11/3/08 to 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/16/08. (tp)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this case will be dismissed without prejudice unless service of process is not effected and proof of service filed by 11/15/2008. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/15/08. (tp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanson v. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meryl Lanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Beth Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?