Medina v. United Christian Evangelistic Association of Florida, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Augusto Medina
Defendant: United Christian Evangelistic Association of Florida, LLC, United Christian Evangelist Association of Florida, Inc., United Christian Evangelist Association, Inc. and Frederick Ike Eikerenkoetter
Case Number: 1:2008cv22111
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Joan A. Lenard
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER denying as moot 249 Motion seal; denying 250 Motion seal. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/21/2010. (tm)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/29/09. (tm)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss. Count I is Dismissed as to all Defendants. The Motion to Dismiss is Denied as to all other Counts. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/9/09. (tm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. United Christian Evangelistic Association of Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusto Medina
Represented By: Jennifer Jean Ator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Christian Evangelistic Association of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Richards Huff Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Christian Evangelist Association of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Richards Huff Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Christian Evangelist Association, Inc.
Represented By: Richards Huff Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Ike Eikerenkoetter
Represented By: Richards Huff Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?