Tazoe et al v. Airbus S.A.S.
Plaintiff: Giselle Garcia, Evandro Santos, Lidia Mancia, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Henry De Salles Canfield, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Dario Scott, Joao Carlos Warmling, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Sandra De Liz, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Roberto Tazoe, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Paulo Calixto, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Karin Gunther Haddad, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Marcela Pierucetti, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Alita Doroti Negretto, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Jose Jarmin Alves, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Marta Kleinowski, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Silvia Cestaro, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Regis De Mello, Karin Ellen Mohr, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Ari Piestun, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Milton Moller Filho, Gabriela Prouty, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Sandra Regina Palomino, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Carlos Sell, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Monique Klein Rocha, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez and Zilma Otilia Dos Santos
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Airbus S.A.S.
3Rd Party Defendant: Empresa Brasileira de Infra-Estrutura Aeroportuaria and Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2008cv23434
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Airplane Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Chris M McAliley
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2011 Filing 173 Appeal Record Returned: Consisting of (3) Volumes of Pleadings, (1) Volume of Transcript and (3) Accordion folders re #165 Notice of Appeal. USCA #09-14847-HH (amb)
March 14, 2011 Filing 172 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) AFFIRM the dismissal of the complaints of the Brazilian family members and the family members of Roberto Tazoe re #165 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Regis De Mello, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Lidia Mancia, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Dario Scott, Luiz Carlos Sell, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Evandro Santos, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Ari Piestun, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Karin Gunther Haddad, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Roberto Tazoe, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Marta Kleinowski, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Silvia Cestaro, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marcela Pierucetti, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza ; Date Issued: 03/08/2011 ; USCA Case Number: 09-14847-HH (amb)
January 28, 2010 Filing 171 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re #165 Notice of Appeal, receipt of: COR/ROA date received by USCA 01/22/2010 USCA number 09-14847-HH (jua)
January 19, 2010 Filing 170 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals (Atlanta Office) Consisting of (3)Volumes of Pleadings,(1)Volume of Transcript and (3)Accordion Folders containing DE#'s 40,47,54,90,102,121-123,132,138,142,149,150,152,158,160,161 re #165 Notice of Appeal, (nc)
January 19, 2010 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE of Readiness transmitted to USCA re #165 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Regis De Mello, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Lidia Mancia, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Dario Scott, Luiz Carlos Sell, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Evandro Santos, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Ari Piestun, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Karin Gunther Haddad, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Roberto Tazoe, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Marta Kleinowski, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Silvia Cestaro, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marcela Pierucetti, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza (Attachments: # (part 2) USCA Appeal# 09-14847-HH(nc)
October 5, 2009 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of forum nonconveniens motion held on 8-5-2009 before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Re: #165 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158. 1-104 pages. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting Robin Dispenzieri before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (rd)
October 2, 2009 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Roberto Tazoe re #165 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. Hearing held on 8/5/09 on the Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens transcript. Order placed by Joel Eaton, Esq. (nc)
September 25, 2009 Filing 166 Clerk's Notice of Receipt of Appeal Filing Fees received on 9/25/09, in the amount of $ 455.00 receipt number 1008829 re: #165 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Regis De Mello, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Lidia Mancia, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Dario Scott, Luiz Carlos Sell, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Evandro Santos, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Ari Piestun, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Karin Gunther Haddad, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Roberto Tazoe, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Marta Kleinowski, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Silvia Cestaro, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marcela Pierucetti, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza (jua)
September 21, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet and Order under appeal sent to US Court of Appeals re #165 Notice of Appeal, as to Roberto Tazoe, et al (nc)
September 21, 2009 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEAL of #163 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr(as ce-Personal Representative of the Estate of Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat), Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, deceased), Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rafaella Bueno, deceased), Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rafaella Bueno Dalprat, deceased), Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Luisa Victoria Da Fonseca, deceased), Roger Victoria Da Fonseca(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Deolinda Magaly Victoria Da Fonseca, deceased), Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Alita Doroti Negretto, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana Carolina Santos Da Cunha, deceased), Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate ofCaio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, deceased), Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, deceased), Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Roberto Tazoe, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Milton Moller Filho, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Regis De Mello, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alanis Ura Dona De Andrade, deceased), Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate ofAndre Ura Dona, deceased), Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, deceased), Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the estate of Bruno Ricardo Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Ari Piestun, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Evandro Santos, Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larissa Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Luiz Fernando Moyses, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. Within ten days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Eaton, Joel)
September 21, 2009 Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Douglas Eaton on behalf of Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr(as ce-Personal Representative of the Estate of Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat), Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, deceased), Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rafaella Bueno, deceased), Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rafaella Bueno Dalprat, deceased), Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Luisa Victoria Da Fonseca, deceased), Roger Victoria Da Fonseca(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Deolinda Magaly Victoria Da Fonseca, deceased), Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Alita Doroti Negretto, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana Carolina Santos Da Cunha, deceased), Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate ofCaio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, deceased), Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, deceased), Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Roberto Tazoe, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Milton Moller Filho, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Regis De Mello, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alanis Ura Dona De Andrade, deceased), Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate ofAndre Ura Dona, deceased), Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, deceased), Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the estate of Bruno Ricardo Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Ari Piestun, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Evandro Santos, Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larissa Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Luiz Fernando Moyses, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia (Eaton, Joel)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting (92) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC;. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/21/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. Filed in all associated cases(dg)
August 10, 2009 Filing 161 SUPPLEMENT to (68 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 61 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 91 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 32 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 61 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 32 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 61 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 15 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 32 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 32 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 32 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 160 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 61 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 62 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 27 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss, (7 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC) Joint MOTION to Dismiss (1) Complaint On Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensJoint MOTION to Dismiss (1) Complaint On Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens, (28 in 1:08-cv-21980-MGC) Joint MOTION to Dismiss (1) Complaint On Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensJoint MOTION to Dismiss (1) Complaint On Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens, (8 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC) Joint MOTION to Dismiss (1) Complaint On Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensJoint MOTION to Dismiss (1) Complaint On Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens by International Aero Engines AG, Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Goodrich Corporation, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., IAE International Aero Engines, AG, Goodrich Corporation, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Goodrich Corp., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp., Airbus S.A.S., International Aero Engines AG, Airbus North American Customer Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alvin F. Lindsay)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
August 5, 2009 Filing 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Oral Argument held on 8/5/2009. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158 Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(im)
August 4, 2009 Filing 160 NOTICE by International Aero Engines AG, Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Goodrich Corporation, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., IAE International Aero Engines, AG, Goodrich Corporation, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Goodrich Corp., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp., Airbus S.A.S., International Aero Engines AG, Airbus North American Customer Services Inc /Notice of Filing of Brazilian Claim by TAM Linhas Aereas, S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 OMNIBUS ORDER denying without prejudice (116) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying (152) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC and all related motions in consolidated cases. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/28/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
July 27, 2009 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss Based on the Forum Non Conveniens Doctrine filed by Airbus S.A.S., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alvin F. Lindsay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
July 23, 2009 Filing 157 Notice of Supplemental Authority re (300 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Roberto Tazoe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit supplemental authority)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Eaton, Joel)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting (295) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC; granting (272) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 0:07-cv-61611-MGC; granting (217) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20778-MGC; granting (211) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20789-MGC; granting (209) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20782-MGC; granting (217) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20790-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20792-MGC; granting (211) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20786-MGC; granting (211) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20796-MGC; granting (211) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20783-MGC; granting (218) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20791-MGC; granting (210) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20798-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20800-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20784-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20794-MGC; granting (216) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20785-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20810-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20811-MGC; granting (210) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20806-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20809-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20808-MGC; granting (216) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20795-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20793-MGC; granting (212) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20819-MGC; granting (212) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20805-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20807-MGC; granting (210) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20818-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20828-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20804-MGC; granting (216) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20817-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20813-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20816-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20827-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20820-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20830-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20826-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20836-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20840-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20846-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20821-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20823-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20839-MGC; granting (212) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20833-MGC; granting (210) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20838-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20829-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20837-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20814-MGC; granting (216) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20824-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20831-MGC; granting (212) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20834-MGC; granting (216) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20844-MGC; granting (218) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20841-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20835-MGC; granting (211) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20825-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20822-MGC; granting (216) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20832-MGC; granting (213) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20845-MGC; granting (210) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20842-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20815-MGC; granting (215) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20916-MGC; granting (214) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20932-MGC; granting (210) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-20959-MGC; granting (212) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-21278-MGC; granting (172) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22222-MGC; granting (175) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22229-MGC; granting (177) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22224-MGC; granting (175) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22225-MGC; granting (177) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22227-MGC; granting (174) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22228-MGC; granting (166) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-22237-MGC; granting (132) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23293-MGC; granting (150) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23290-MGC; granting (151) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23291-MGC; granting (129) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23289-MGC; granting (131) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23288-MGC; granting (162) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23287-MGC; granting (146) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23292-MGC; granting (129) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23314-MGC; granting (146) Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom in case 1:08-cv-23434-MGC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/23/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(tm)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting (294) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC; granting (271) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 0:07-cv-61611-MGC; granting (216) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20778-MGC; granting (210) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20789-MGC; granting (208) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20782-MGC; granting (216) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20790-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20792-MGC; granting (210) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20786-MGC; granting (210) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20796-MGC; granting (210) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20783-MGC; granting (217) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20791-MGC; granting (209) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20798-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20800-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20784-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20794-MGC; granting (215) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20785-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20810-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20811-MGC; granting (209) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20806-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20809-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20808-MGC; granting (215) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20795-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20793-MGC; granting (211) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20819-MGC; granting (211) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20805-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20807-MGC; granting (209) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20818-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20828-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20804-MGC; granting (215) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20817-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20813-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20816-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20827-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20820-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20830-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20826-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20836-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20840-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20846-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20821-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20823-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20839-MGC; granting (211) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20833-MGC; granting (209) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20838-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20829-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20837-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20814-MGC; granting (215) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20824-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20831-MGC; granting (211) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20834-MGC; granting (215) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20844-MGC; granting (217) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20841-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20835-MGC; granting (210) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20825-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20822-MGC; granting (215) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20832-MGC; granting (212) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20845-MGC; granting (209) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20842-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20815-MGC; granting (214) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20916-MGC; granting (213) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20932-MGC; granting (209) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-20959-MGC; granting (211) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-21278-MGC; granting (171) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22222-MGC; granting (174) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22229-MGC; granting (176) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22224-MGC; granting (174) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22225-MGC; granting (176) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22227-MGC; granting (173) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22228-MGC; granting (165) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-22237-MGC; granting (131) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23293-MGC; granting (149) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23290-MGC; granting (150) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23291-MGC; granting (128) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23289-MGC; granting (130) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23288-MGC; granting (161) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23287-MGC; granting (145) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23292-MGC; granting (128) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23314-MGC; granting (145) Motion leave to use PowerPoint Presentation at the 8/5/09 hearing in case 1:08-cv-23434-MGC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/21/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(tm)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order Cancelling Deadline/Hearing. The status conference set for July 22, 2009 is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/17/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (edn)
July 17, 2009 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Douglas Eaton on behalf of Roberto Tazoe Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Eaton, Joel)
July 17, 2009 Filing 152 NOTICE by Roberto Tazoe of filing a certified copy of the transcript of the deposition of Keith S. Rosenn (Attachments: #1 Transcripts deposition of Keith S. Rosenn (certified))Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
July 16, 2009 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition to Manufacturing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Larry Rockliff excerpt)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Eaton, Joel)
July 16, 2009 Filing 150 NOTICE by Roberto Tazoe of Filing Affidavit of Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid, #2 Exhibit 1 interrogatory example, #3 Exhibit Request for production example, #4 Exhibit depo transcript Jose Americo Basso Amaral)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
July 15, 2009 Filing 149 NOTICE by Roberto Tazoe of Filing Transcript of Deposition of Keith Rosenn (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Depo of Keith S. Rosenn)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 7/22/2009 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke.. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/14/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (tm)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY ONLY AND REQUIRING NOTICE FROM THE PARTIES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/14/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (tm)
July 9, 2009 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom at the August 5, 2009 Hearing by International Aero Engines AG. Responses due by 7/27/2009 Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Dunn, Richard)
July 9, 2009 Filing 145 Agreed MOTION For Leave To Use Powerpoint Presentation at the August 5, 2009 Hearing by International Aero Engines AG. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Dunn, Richard)
July 6, 2009 Filing 144 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith S. Rosenn by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
July 2, 2009 Filing 143 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith S. Rosenn by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 29, 2009 Filing 142 SUPPLEMENT Defendants' Airbus S.A.S.'s, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc.'s, Goodrich Corporation's, and IAE International AERO Engines AG's Supplement in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based On The Forum Non Conveniens Doctrine by Airbus S.A.S., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alvin F. Lindsay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting (284) Motion for Clarification in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC; granting (266) Motion for Clarification in case 0:07-cv-61611-MGC; granting (210) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20778-MGC; granting (204) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20789-MGC; granting (202) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20782-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20790-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20792-MGC; granting (204) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20786-MGC; granting (204) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20796-MGC; granting (204) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20783-MGC; granting (210) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20791-MGC; granting (203) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20798-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20800-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20784-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20794-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20785-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20810-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20811-MGC; granting (203) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20806-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20809-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20808-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20795-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20793-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20819-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20805-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20807-MGC; granting (203) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20818-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20828-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20804-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20817-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20813-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20816-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20827-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20820-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20830-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20826-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20836-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20840-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20846-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20821-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20823-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20839-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20833-MGC; granting (203) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20838-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20829-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20837-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20814-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20824-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20831-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20834-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20844-MGC; granting (210) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20841-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20835-MGC; granting (204) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20825-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20822-MGC; granting (209) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20832-MGC; granting (206) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20845-MGC; granting (203) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20842-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20815-MGC; granting (208) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20916-MGC; granting (207) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20932-MGC; granting (203) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-20959-MGC; granting (205) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-21278-MGC; granting (165) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22222-MGC; granting (168) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22229-MGC; granting (170) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22224-MGC; granting (168) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22225-MGC; granting (170) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22227-MGC; granting (167) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22228-MGC; granting (159) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-22237-MGC; granting (124) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23293-MGC; granting (141) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23290-MGC; granting (142) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23291-MGC; granting (121) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23289-MGC; granting (123) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23288-MGC; granting (154) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23287-MGC; granting (138) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23292-MGC; granting (121) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23314-MGC; granting (139) Motion for Clarification in case 1:08-cv-23434-MGC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/25/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(tm)
June 23, 2009 Filing 140 RESPONSE to Motion re (206 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 170 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 121 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 138 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 266 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 202 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 154 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 210 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 139 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 159 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 210 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 141 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 142 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 170 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 124 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 210 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 121 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 284 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 123 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 209 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC) MOTION for clarification, (202 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 201 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 121 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 202 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 201 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 201 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 202 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 201 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 122 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 202 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 265 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 200 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 201 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 208 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 119 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 201 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 140 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 281 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 139 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 157 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 119 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 202 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 152 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 203 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 204 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 205 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 206 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 207 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC) MOTION for clarification and Emergency Motion for Clarification of the Court's Order Staying Merits Discovery filed by Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus North American Customer Services Inc. Replies due by 7/6/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
June 19, 2009 Filing 139 MOTION for clarification EMERGENCY Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Staying Merits Discovery (D.E. 269) by Tam Linhas Aereas. Responses due by 7/9/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript Excerpts)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
June 16, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: deposition transcript by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Vol 1 of 5/21-5/22/09 deposition of Yannick Malinge, #2 Transcripts Vol 2 of 5/21-5/22/09 deposition of Yannick Malinge)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 16, 2009 Filing 137 MOTION for clarification of the Court's Order Staying Merits Discovery (D.E. 269) by Tam Linhas Aereas. Responses due by 7/6/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing Excerpts)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting (192) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC and all corresponding motions in the consolidated cases. Plaintiffs shall respond to fully to all outstanding discovery requests propounded by Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc. and provide all verified interrogatory responses no later than June 18, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DETERMINE WHETHER COUNSEL VIOLATED RULE 26(G) and 28 USC 1927 TO DETERMINE CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE AND TO COMPEL (188 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER ON DEFENDANT AIRBUS NORTH AMERICA CUSTOMER SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL TAM LINHAS AEREAS, granting in part and denying in part (201) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. (See Order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying without prejudice (224) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC (and corresponding motions in all consolidated cases). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Issuing Letter Rogatory sent to Brasil re #2 Summons Issued for Service Abroad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/9/2009. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (vp)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting (228 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Motion for Leave to File A Reply in Support of its Motion to Determine Whether Counsel for Plaintiffs Violated Rule 26(g) and 28 USC 1927 to Determine Claim of Privilege, and to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL; granting Motion to Seal(227 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part (226) Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Regarding Deposition Scheduling in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC as follows: Paragraph 2 of this Court's Order Following April 21, 2009 Discovery Conference [DE 191] shall apply to all parties, including Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL (187 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC). The motion is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER STAYING MERITS DISCOVERY, except discovery that had been scheduled to take place in June is STAYED until resolution of the FNC motion. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/8/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (tm)
June 9, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Supplemental briefs re FNC motion due 6/29/2009. Plaintiffs' Responses to FNC motion due by 7/16/2009 Defendants' Replies due by 7/27/2009. Oral Argument re FNC motion set for 8/5/2009 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(tm)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OMNIBUS ORDER MEMORIALIZING HEARING, DENYING re (98 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non ConveniensPlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens filed by Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Regis De Mello, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Luiz Carlos Sell, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Jose Jardim Alves, Eduardo Mancia, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Sandra Regina Palomino, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Evandro Santos, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Marilda Ura, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, John J Uustal, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Robin R Anderson, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Elza Silva Ferraz, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Roberto Tazoe, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Silvia Cestaro, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Angelino Pereira Severo, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Lidia Mancia, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Dario Scott, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Silvia Volpi Scott, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Sandra De Liz, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Jose Jarmin Alves, Soroya Machado Charara, Ari Piestun, Karin Gunther Haddad, Magda Luiza Rojek, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Henry De Salles Canfield, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Richard De Salles Canfield, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Marcela Pierucetti, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza and AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/8/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (tm)
June 8, 2009 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #55 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #37 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint filed by Airbus S.A.S.. (Lindsay, Alvin)
June 5, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Deposition Errata Sheet by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Errata Yannick Malinge)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 4, 2009 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re (164 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 159 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 124 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 93 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 125 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 89 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 224 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 122 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 116 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 97 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 96 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 159 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 125 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 127 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 127 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS filed by Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services Inc, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Ricardo Martinez-Cid)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
June 3, 2009 Filing 122 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: transcript of deposition of Yannick Malinge by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Vol 1 of deposition of Yannick Malinge, #2 Transcripts Vol 2 of deposition of Yannick Malinge)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 3, 2009 Filing 121 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel the Re-Deposition of Airbus SAS Corporate Representative Regarding Knowledge of How and Why the Accident Occurred by Roberto Tazoe. Responses due by 6/22/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Plaintiff's Notice of 30(b)(6) Videotape Depo re knowledge of accident of 7/17/07, #2 Exhibit B--excerpts from deposition of Yannick Malinge)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 3, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 6/8/2009 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(tm)
June 2, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Rockliff (Airbus) by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 2, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jean Hersen (Airbus) by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 2, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Vincent (IAE) by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
June 1, 2009 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re (222 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines, and For a Discovery Scheduling Conference on Joint Status Report (Depositions) re (191) Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, (40) Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines, and For a Discovery Scheduling Conference on Joint Status Report (Depositions) re (191) Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, (40) Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, filed by Roberto Tazoe. Replies due by 6/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (254) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to (224 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS. If necessary, Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS shall file their response no later than 6/4/2009. The response shall be limited to 3 pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/29/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (253) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re (222 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines, and For a Discovery Scheduling Conference on Joint Status Report (Depositions). (Responses due by 6/1/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/29/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
May 29, 2009 Filing 114 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (224 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS, (251 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Order on Motion to Strike by Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Airbus North American Customer Services Inc, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
May 27, 2009 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #55 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #37 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint filed by Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.. (Knight, Christopher)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 222 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines, and For a Discovery Scheduling Conference on Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying (229) Motion to Strike in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/27/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
May 22, 2009 Filing 110 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re #108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Airbus S.A.S.s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Third-Party Defendant TAM Linhas Aereas, S.A.s Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.. Error - Incorrect Document Link/No Link; Correction - Document relinked properly by Clerk. Instruction to filer - In the future, please link the document to the proper entry. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ON JUNE 8, 2009 ( Discovery Hearing set for 6/8/2009 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/21/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
May 20, 2009 Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #55 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #37 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knight, Christopher) Modified on 5/22/2009 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #60]
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REQUIRING AGREED DATES FOR DISCOVERY CONFERENCE to be submitted by the parties no later than May 22, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/20/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
May 19, 2009 Filing 106 Defendant's MOTION for Hearing re #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum of Law in Support ThereofDefendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Airbus S.A.S.. (Lindsay, Alvin) Modified on 5/20/2009 (tp).
May 19, 2009 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereofon the filed by Airbus S.A.S.. Replies due by 6/1/2009. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindsay, Alvin) Modified on 5/20/2009 (tp).
May 19, 2009 Filing 104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Goodrich Corp. pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) regarding investigation into accident of 7/17/07 by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 18, 2009 Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re (165 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 123 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 128 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 97 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 126 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 226 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 126 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 125 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 239 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 117 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 90 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 128 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 94 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC) MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Regarding Deposition Scheduling filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. Replies due by 5/29/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
May 18, 2009 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re (165 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 123 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 128 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 97 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 126 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 226 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 126 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 125 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 117 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 90 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 128 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 94 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC) MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Regarding Deposition Scheduling filed by Roberto Tazoe. Replies due by 5/29/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Jan 21 2009 email from Lidia Aja, #2 Exhibit 2--Emails from Airbus counsel, #3 Exhibit 3--Lidia Aja Mar 25, 2009 email, #4 Exhibit 4--(composite) Emails from Plaintiffs' counsel, #5 Exhibit 5--excerpt from Apr 21 2009 hrg transcript, #6 Exhibit 6--Richard Lorenzo May 4 2009 email)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 15, 2009 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re (201 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION to Compel Defendant Tam Linhas Aereas to Produce Documents Responsive to the Third Request for Production filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
May 15, 2009 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re (201 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION to Compel Defendant Tam Linhas Aereas to Produce Documents Responsive to the Third Request for Production filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
May 15, 2009 Filing 99 RESPONSE/REPLY to (188 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant ANACS Motion to Seal by Roberto Tazoe. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 15, 2009 Filing 98 NOTICE of Striking (220 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Notice of Compliance filed by Roberto Tazoe by Roberto Tazoe Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 15, 2009 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re (229 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION to Strike (224) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS MOTION to Strike (224) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS filed by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--omitted email from chain)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 15, 2009 Filing 96 RESPONSE/REPLY to (187 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc.'s Motion for the Court to Determine Whether Counsel for Plaintiffs Violated Rule 26(g) and 28 USC 1927 to Determine Claim of Privilege, and to Compel by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Email from Thad Damaris, #2 Exhibit B--Email from Richard Lorenzo, #3 Exhibit C--excerpts of Plaintiff Lucia Shioharas deposition, #4 Supplement D--excerpts of Plaintiff Luciana Haensel Mattias deposition)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 15, 2009 Filing 95 NOTICE of Striking (219 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Notice of Compliance,, filed by Roberto Tazoe by Roberto Tazoe Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting (231) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/14/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(dg)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (226 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 123 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 128 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 126 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 128 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 125 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 126 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 117 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 239 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 168 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 164 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 165 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 167 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 163 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 166 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 160 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 162 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 161 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 90 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 97 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 94 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC) MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Regarding Deposition Scheduling.( Responses due by 5/18/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/14/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (dg)
May 13, 2009 Filing 92 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re (220 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Notice of Compliance filed by Roberto Tazoe. Error - Document and Event Selected do not match; Instruction to filer - File a Notice of Striking docket entry and refile the document correctly. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(ls)
May 13, 2009 Filing 91 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re (219 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Notice of Compliance,, filed by Roberto Tazoe. Error - Document and Event Selected do not match; Instruction to filer - File a Notice of Striking docket entry and refile the document correctly. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(ls)
May 11, 2009 Filing 90 MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Regarding Deposition Scheduling by International Aero Engines AG, Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., Goodrich Corporation, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., IAE International Aero Engines, AG, Goodrich Corporation, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Goodrich Corp., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp., Airbus S.A.S., International Aero Engines AG, Airbus North American Customer Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
May 11, 2009 Filing 89 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Airbus SAS and ANACS by Roberto Tazoe. Responses due by 5/29/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Screen shots of files of Airbus & ANACS production, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 11, 2009 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re (131 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 192 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 130 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 138 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 138 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 130 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC) MOTION to Compel and for an Order Providing Notice of Possible Dismissal for Failure to Respond to Discovery Requests filed by Roberto Tazoe. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting (218) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re MOTION to Compel and for an Order Providing Notice of Possible Dismissal for Failure to Respond to Discovery Requests ( Responses due by 5/11/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
May 8, 2009 Filing 86 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order by filing Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant ANACS Motion to Seal by Roberto Tazoe Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 85 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order by filing Plaintiffs' Response to ANACS' Motion for the Court to Determine Whether Counsel for Plaintiffs Violated Rule 26(g) and 28 USC 1927 to Determine Claim of Privilege, and to Compel by Roberto Tazoe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--email from Thad Demeris (4/25/09), #2 Exhibit B--email from Richard Lorenzo (3/31/09), #3 Exhibit C--excerpts of Plaintiff Lucia Shiohara's deposition, #4 Exhibit D--excerpts of Plaintiff Luciana Haensel Mattia's deposition)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 84 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (192 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION to Compel and for an Order Providing Notice of Possible Dismissal for Failure to Respond to Discovery Requests by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Airbus S.A.S. regarding the relationship between Airbus, S.A.S. and Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc. by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Marks, Steven)
May 8, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Airbus S.A.S. regarding Airbus A320's automated systems (auto thrust, thust levers, reversers, auto ground spoilers, auto brakes) by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Marks, Steven)
May 8, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Airbus S.A.S. regarding operation of Airbus aircraft at Congonhas Airport by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Marks, Steven)
May 8, 2009 Filing 80 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Airbus S.A.S. regarding the development and implementation of H2F3 modification by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Marks, Steven)
May 8, 2009 Filing 79 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Rockliff by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Geoff Corlett by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Albert Urdiroz by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bernard Honnons by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Lafontan by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Philippe Feuillard by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Da Silva by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Da Silva by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 71 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jean Daney by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Blancaneaux by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 8, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nicholas Puharre by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY MOTION as to (201 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION to Compel Defendant Tam Linhas Aereas to Produce Documents Responsive to the Third Request for Production.( Responses due by 5/15/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/7/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (wc)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting (195) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/5/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
May 5, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thierry Thoreau by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 5, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Airbus S.A.S. regarding history of prior incidents and/or accidents of Airbus aircraft by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 5, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Airbus S.A.S. regarding investigation into accident of 7/17/07 by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs to respond to MOTION to Compel filed by Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc. on or before 5/8/09. In 07-21941-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 138 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 138 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 130 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 134 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 135 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 137 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 133 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 136 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 130 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 132 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 131 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC), 38 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 41 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 37 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 33 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 23 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 13 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 13 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/1/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (vp)
May 4, 2009 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum of Law in Support ThereofDefendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr(as ce-Personal Representative of the Estate of Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat), Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, deceased), Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rafaella Bueno, deceased), Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno(as co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rafaella Bueno Dalprat, deceased), Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Luisa Victoria Da Fonseca, deceased), Roger Victoria Da Fonseca(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Deolinda Magaly Victoria Da Fonseca, deceased), Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Alita Doroti Negretto, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana Carolina Santos Da Cunha, deceased), Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate ofCaio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, deceased), Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, deceased), Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Roberto Tazoe, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Milton Moller Filho, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Regis De Mello, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alanis Ura Dona De Andrade, deceased), Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate ofAndre Ura Dona, deceased), Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, deceased), Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the estate of Bruno Ricardo Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Ari Piestun, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Evandro Santos, Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larissa Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, deceased), Luiz Fernando Moyses, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 4, 2009 Filing 61 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc.'s Motion by Roberto Tazoe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
May 4, 2009 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #55 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #37 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Airbus S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindsay, Alvin)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Requiring Expedited Response to Sealed Motions [DE 187 and 188]. Plaintiffs' responses due by 5/8/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/1/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Following April 21, 2009 Discovery Conference (Status Report due by 5/11/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/29/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (88) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20778-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20789-MGC; granting (58) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20782-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20790-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20792-MGC; granting (59) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20786-MGC; granting (58) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20796-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20783-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20791-MGC; granting (58) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20798-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20800-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20784-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20794-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20785-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20810-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20811-MGC; granting (58) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20806-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20809-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20808-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20795-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20793-MGC; granting (61) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20819-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20805-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20807-MGC; granting (61) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20818-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20828-MGC; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20804-MGC; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20817-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20813-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20816-MGC; granting (67) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20827-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20820-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20830-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20826-MGC; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20836-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20840-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20846-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20821-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20823-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20839-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20833-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20838-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20829-MGC; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20837-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20814-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20824-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20831-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20834-MGC; granting (66) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20844-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20841-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20835-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20825-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20822-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20832-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20845-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20842-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20815-MGC; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20916-MGC; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20932-MGC; granting (62) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-20959-MGC; granting (61) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-21278-MGC; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-22222-MGC; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-22229-MGC; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-22224-MGC; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-22225-MGC; granting (31) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-22227-MGC; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-22228-MGC; granting (12) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond in case 1:08-cv-23287-MGC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/28/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(wc)
April 16, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE by Roberto Tazoe re #34 Notice (Other) of Filing Affidavit of Accurate Translation of Original French Hague Certificaate of Service upon Airbus, S.A.S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Accurate Translation)(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
April 15, 2009 Filing 55 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #37 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.. Responses due by 5/4/2009 (Goodner, Helaine)
April 15, 2009 Filing 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Airbus S.A.S.. Responses due by 5/4/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rosenn Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jefferies Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bartron Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rockliff Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Hennessee Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Saunders Declaration)(Lindsay, Alvin)
April 14, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative of Defendant International Aero Engines AG regarding investigation of accident of 7/17/07 by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, ( Discovery Hearing set for 4/21/2009 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/9/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
April 8, 2009 Filing 51 RESPONSE/REPLY to Court's April 7, 2009 Order Granting TAM's Motion to Modify Court Order and Renewed Motion for Scheduling Conference by IAE International. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Nold, Allison)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting (178) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/7/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
April 6, 2009 Filing 49 MOTION to Amend/Correct /Modify Order Granting Motion for Discovery Conference (D.E. 177) and Response to Defendants Goodrich Corporations, IAE International Aero Engines AGs, Airbus S.A.Ss and Airbus North America Customer Service, Inc.s Joint Motion for Discovery Scheduling Conference (D.E. 173) and Supplement to Joint Motion for Discovery Scheduling Conference (D.E. 176) by Tam Linhas Aereas. Responses due by 4/23/2009 Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
April 3, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 4/10/2009 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting (173) Motion for Hearing in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/3/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
April 3, 2009 Filing 47 Notice of Supplemental Authority re (44 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC) MOTION for Hearing (Joint Supplemental Memo of Law) by Airbus Industrie G.I.E, Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Scott, Thomas)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Requiring Supplement to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/2/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
April 2, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE to Take Deposition of International Aero Engines, AG regarding investigation of accident by Roberto Tazoe.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
April 2, 2009 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Discovery Scheduling Conference) by International Aero Engines AG, Airbus S.A.S., Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Scott, Thomas)
April 1, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE to Take Deposition of International Aero Engines AG regarding investigation of accident by Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, John C. Duane, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, John J Uustal, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting (166 in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
March 26, 2009 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re (110 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 26 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 107 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 28 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 107 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 114 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 108 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 113 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 114 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 107 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 108 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 108 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 113 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 46 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 114 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 152 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 108 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 58 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 24 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 46 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 24 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 107 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 113 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 108 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 113 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 112 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 113 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 110 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 109 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 111 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (116 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to All Cross-claims of Defendants Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp. And IAE International Aero Engines MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (116 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to All Cross-claims of Defendants Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp. And IAE International Aero Engines MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (116 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to All Cross-claims of Defendants Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corp. And IAE International Aero Engines to Defendants Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Goodrich Corporation and IAE International Aero Engines A.G.s Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant/Cross-Defendant Tam Linhas Areas, S.A.s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendants Cross-Claims filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Goodner, Helaine)
March 26, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ANACS Fourth Requests for Production dated February 25, 2009 by Tam Linhas Aereas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ANACS Fourth Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit Composite B - ANACS First, Second and Third Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit Composite C - ANACS Fifth Requests for Production and First Requests for Admissions, #4 Exhibit D - E-mail between Al Lindsay, Esq. and Kristina A. Delgado, Esq.)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
March 25, 2009 Filing 39 Summons on a Third Party Complaint Issued as to Empresa Brasileira de Infra-Estrutura Aeroportuaria. (tas)
March 25, 2009 Filing 38 Summons on a Third Party Complaint Issued as to Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.. (tas)
March 23, 2009 Filing 37 Original ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand of Airbus S.A.S., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A., Empresa Brasileira de Infra-Estrutura Aeroportuaria by Airbus S.A.S..(Lindsay, Alvin)
March 20, 2009 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Airbus S.A.S.s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims and Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc.s, Goodrich Corporations and IAE International Aero Engines A.G.s Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Tam Linhas Aereas(a foreign corporation). Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Goodner, Helaine)
March 17, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Airbus, S.A.S. by Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, John C. Duane, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
March 17, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE by Roberto Tazoe re #2 Summons Issued for Service Abroad of Filing Return of Service on Airbus S.A.S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit return of service)(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
March 11, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Compliance With Court Order by Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia re (94 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC) Order Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (100, 101 in 07-21941) Defendants' MOTION to Compel, (107 in 07-21941) MOTION for Entry of Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2009 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Requiring Compliance With Local Rule Regarding Correspondence With The Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/4/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (113) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/4/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (93) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC; (162) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-61611-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/4/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
March 2, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Striking (65 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 99 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 99 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 104 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 104 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 99 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 63 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 105 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 16 in 1:08-cv-23289-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 99 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 16 in 1:08-cv-23314-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 140 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 98 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 99 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 99 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 63 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 26 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 105 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 58 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 104 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 104 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 103 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 105 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 50 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 104 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 199 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 102 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 101 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 19 in 1:08-cv-23293-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 18 in 1:08-cv-23288-MGC, 100 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC) Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Regis De Mello, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Luiz Carlos Sell, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Jose Jardim Alves, Eduardo Mancia, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Sandra Regina Palomino, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Evandro Santos, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Marilda Ura, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, John J Uustal, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Robin R Anderson, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Elza Silva Ferraz, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Roberto Tazoe, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Silvia Cestaro, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Angelino Pereira Severo, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Lidia Mancia, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Dario Scott, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Silvia Volpi Scott, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Sandra De Liz, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Jose Jarmin Alves, Soroya Machado Charara, Ari Piestun, Karin Gunther Haddad, Magda Luiza Rojek, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Henry De Salles Canfield, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Richard De Salles Canfield, Zenaide Dos Santos, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Marcela Pierucetti, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza by Marilda Ura, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pe
March 2, 2009 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re (76 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 45 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 173 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 41 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 26 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 107 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 12 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 16 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 10 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 36 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 41 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 16 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. Replies due by 3/12/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B Stipulated Confidentiality Agr & Protective Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
March 2, 2009 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re (76 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 45 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 173 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 41 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 26 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 107 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 12 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 16 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 10 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 36 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 41 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 79 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 78 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 16 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Marilda Ura, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, John J Uustal, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. Replies due by 3/12/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B Stipulated Confidentiality Agr & Protective Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Redocketing February 12, 2009 Order Requiring Response to #107 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 2/27/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
February 27, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE by Tam Linhas Aereas of Filing Credentials of Geraldo Costa De Meneses (Attachments: #1 Credentials of Geraldo Costa De Meneses)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
February 26, 2009 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re (69 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 29 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 96 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 164 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 36 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 8 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 17 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 9 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 4 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens filed by Marilda Ura, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Paulo Calixto, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Zilma Otillia Dos Santos, Zenaide Dos Santos, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A ANACS 4th RFP to TAM, #2 Exhibit Ex B Pretrial Order #2 & proposed order, #3 Exhibit Ex C Order granting agreed mot of Rolls Royce, #4 Exhibit Ex D Dec 15 2008 ltr from Steven Marks, #5 Exhibit Ex E Jan 21 2009 email to all counsel)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
February 26, 2009 Filing 22 RESPONSE/REPLY of Defendant TAM Linhas Aereas, S.A. to Defendant Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc.s Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc.s Third Request for Production Dated January 12, 2009 and Airbus S.A.Ss Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to TAMs First Request for Production in Camargo Only (D.E. 121) filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY ONLY AND REQUIRING NOTICE FROM PARTIES RE: OTHER RELATED CASES NOT YET ASSOCIATED by 3/09/09. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/25/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (tm)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING LETTERS ROGATORY to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/25/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (tm)
February 23, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to (74 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss by Marilda Ura, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
February 22, 2009 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re (86 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 114 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 47 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 87 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 48 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 180 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 47 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 51 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 87 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 14 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 18 in 1:08-cv-23292-MGC, 87 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 22 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 48 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 42 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 82 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 80 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 32 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 81 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 87 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 48 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 22 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 88 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 86 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 83 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 87 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 84 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 85 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Custoner Services,Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services, Inc., Airbus North American Customer Services Inc. Replies due by 3/2/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Lindsay, Alvin)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #114 (in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Defendant Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc.'s Third Request for Production Dated January 12, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 2/20/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: #113 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Airbus North America Customer Services, Inc. and Airbus, S.A.S. : Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2009 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 2/19/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al. (lc2)
February 17, 2009 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re (74 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 13 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 13 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 33 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 37 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 76 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 77 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 75 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 38 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 37 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 101 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 23 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 41 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC) MOTION to Compel Discovery, (100 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC) Joint MOTION to Compel Discovery D.E. 100 and D.E. 101 filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Wilson Newton De Mello Neto)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
February 17, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Airbus North America Customer Services Inc's Third Request for Production dated January 12, 2009 by Tam Linhas Aereas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ANACS Third Request for Production, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
February 13, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Airbuss North America Customer Services, Inc. and Airbus, S.A.S. by Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, John J Uustal, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. Responses due by 3/5/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ANACS Obj & Resp to Plaintiff 1st RFP)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
February 12, 2009 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re (69 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 29 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 96 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 164 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 36 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 8 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 17 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 9 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 4 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Joint Motion To Dismiss filed by International Aero Engines AG. Replies due by 2/23/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Dunn, Richard)
February 12, 2009 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re (72 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 63 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 64 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 63 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 67 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 93 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC) MOTION to Compel Discovery to TAM Linhas Aereas Production of Settlement Documents filed by Tam Linhas Aereas. Replies due by 2/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Goodner, Helaine)
February 12, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Protective Order Entry of Protective Order by Tam Linhas Aereas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting (105) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:07-cv-21941-MGC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 2/11/09. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(lc2)
February 11, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responses to Discovery Motions D.E. 93 and D.E. 100 and 101 by Tam Linhas Aereas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Knight, Christopher)
February 2, 2009 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Regis De Mello, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Luiz Carlos Sell, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Jose Jardim Alves, Eduardo Mancia, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Sandra Regina Palomino, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Evandro Santos, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Robin R Anderson, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Elza Silva Ferraz, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Roberto Tazoe, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Silvia Cestaro, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Angelino Pereira Severo, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Lidia Mancia, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Dario Scott, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Silvia Volpi Scott, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Sandra De Liz, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Jose Jarmin Alves, Soroya Machado Charara, Ari Piestun, Karin Gunther Haddad, Magda Luiza Rojek, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Henry De Salles Canfield, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Richard De Salles Canfield, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Marcela Pierucetti, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza. Error - Document Unreadable/Improper format; Instruction to filer - File a Notice of Striking docket entry and refile a legible copy of the document. (ls)
January 30, 2009 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to (65 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC) MOTION to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens by Marilda Ura, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, John J Uustal, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
January 30, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Striking (69 in 1:08-cv-20825-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20796-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20782-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20808-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20804-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20826-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20829-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20784-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20786-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20916-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20793-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22228-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20810-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20823-MGC, 65 in 1:08-cv-20798-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20822-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20817-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20816-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20959-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20815-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20819-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22225-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20805-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-20818-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20814-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20785-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20791-MGC, 29 in 1:08-cv-22237-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20845-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20824-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20789-MGC, 96 in 1:07-cv-21941-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20932-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20821-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20800-MGC, 164 in 0:07-cv-61611-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20839-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20778-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20790-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20836-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20828-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20809-MGC, 36 in 1:08-cv-22227-MGC, 8 in 1:08-cv-23290-MGC, 66 in 1:08-cv-20806-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20795-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20794-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20842-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22229-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22224-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20840-MGC, 72 in 1:08-cv-20837-MGC, 34 in 1:08-cv-22222-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20807-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20833-MGC, 17 in 1:08-cv-23287-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20831-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20832-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20813-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20783-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20835-MGC, 70 in 1:08-cv-20792-MGC, 68 in 1:08-cv-21278-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20834-MGC, 9 in 1:08-cv-23291-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20830-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20820-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20811-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20846-MGC, 73 in 1:08-cv-20844-MGC, 74 in 1:08-cv-20827-MGC, 71 in 1:08-cv-20841-MGC, 69 in 1:08-cv-20838-MGC, 4 in 1:08-cv-23434-MGC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Regis De Mello, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Gabriela Prouty, Luiz Carlos Sell, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Jose Jardim Alves, Eduardo Mancia, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Sandra Regina Palomino, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Evandro Santos, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Monique Klein Rocha, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Robin R Anderson, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Elza Silva Ferraz, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr., Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Roberto Tazoe, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Alita Doroti Negretto, Giselle Garcia, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Silvia Cestaro, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Angelino Pereira Severo, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Paulo Calixto, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Lidia Mancia, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Dario Scott, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Silvia Volpi Scott, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Sandra De Liz, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Jose Jarmin Alves, Soroya Machado Charara, Ari Piestun, Karin Gunther Haddad, Magda Luiza Rojek, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Joao Carlos Warmling, Henry De Salles Canfield, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Karin Ellen Mohr, Henry De Salles Canfield, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Richard De Salles Canfield, Milton Moller Filho, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Marcela Pierucetti, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza by Marilda Ura, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, John J Uustal, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Alita Doroti Negretto, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Roberto Tazoe, Eni Terezinha
January 29, 2009 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Forum Non Conveniens by Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Joice Helena Vinholes Oliveria, Fernando Antonio Laroque Oliveria, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Melissa Ura Dona Andrade, Osvaldo Lopes Correa Gomes, Roberto Tazoe, Simone Cristina Almeida Felix Alencar, Mauricio De Avila Severo, Vinicius De Avila Severo, Angelino Pereira Severo, Eva Pinto Da Luz, Leticia Rabelo Da Silva, Elaine Ribeiro De Mello, Carlos Alberto Rodriguez Almeida, Libania Rodriguez Almeida, Magda Luiza Rojek, Robin R Anderson, Carlos E. A. Camargo, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Karin Ellen Mohr, Alejandro Guillermo Camozzi, Evandro Santos, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Marcia Aparecida Soares Leite, Lidia Mancia, Eduardo Mancia, Jose Jardim Alves, Silvania Regina De Avila Alves, Neusa Maria De Oliveira, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Maria Massera De Arruda Xavier, Lina Barbosa Cassol, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Elza Silva Ferraz, Luiz Carlos Sell, Alita Doroti Negretto, Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Enrico Shiohara, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Guilherme Duque Estrada De Moraes, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Paulo Rogerio Amoretty Souza, Dario Scott, Silvia Volpi Scott, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Caio Felipe Santos Da Cunha, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Marcela Pierucetti, Jose Carlos Pierucetti, Elza Silva Ferraz, Elenilze Almeida Ferraz, Diogo Casagrande Salcedo, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Elza De Silva Ferraz, Caio Augusto Bueno Dalprat, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Milton Moller Filho, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Ivanaldo Arruda Da Cunha, Lucas Palomino Mateddi, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Monique Klein Rocha, Jose Americo Flores Amaral, Tereza Martins Costa Kessler Da Silveira, Paulo De Tarso Dresch Da Silveira, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Soroya Machado Charara, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Rosely Aparecida Teixeira Buzzanelli, Giselle Garcia, Jose Antonio Rodrigues Santos Silva, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Cassio Vierira Servulo Da Cunha, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Valdemarina Bidone E Souza, Henry De Salles Canfield, Richard De Salles Canfield, Ari Piestun, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Costa Bueno, Luciana Haensel Mattia, Sandra De Liz, Irenice Maria De Cunha Souza, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigues Henrique Pinto, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Gabriela Prouty, Rubem Wiethaeuper, Silvia Cestaro, Estate of Adrien Jeremie Julien Bisson, Luiz Fernando Moyses, Rebeca Gunther Haddad, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Claudia Kodaira Goes, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Jose Luiz De Almeida Dona, Jose Luiz Almeida Dona Dona, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Regis De Mello, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza, Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Dario Scott, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Marcela Pierucetti, Lidia Mancia, Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi, Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr, Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno, Karin Ellen Mohr, Joao Carlos Warmling, Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling, Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo, Ana Silvia Volpi Scott, Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo, Roger Victoria Da Fonseca, Monique Klein Rocha, Gloria Barbosa Cassol, Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol, Sandra De Liz, Jose Jarmin Alves, Pedro Batista Kleinowski, Marta Kleinowski, Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes, Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss, Sergio Luis Mateddi, Sandra Regina Palomino, Archelau De Arruda Xavier, Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza, Gabriela Prouty, Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira, Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa, Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa, Lourdes Sasso Bilibio, Christophe Alfred Haddad, Karin Gunther Haddad, Mauricio Simonetti Pereira, Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido, Regiany Cristina Lulio, Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz, Ana Paula Nunes Marlon, Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz, Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez, Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz, Thiago Soczeki de Paula, Paulo Calixto, Zilma Otilia Dos Santos, Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos, Jose Carlos Dornelles, Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles, Teresinha Maria Stumpf, Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli, Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva, Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto, Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira, Luiz Carlos Sell, Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez, Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara, Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite, Tabata Cassenote Mendonca, Michele Feingold Pedreira, Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha, Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira, Roberto De Azevedo E Souza, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes, Elza Da Silva Ferraz, Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho, Silvia Cestaro, Mirian Zeilman Drumm, Henry De Salles Canfield, Giselle Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-21941-MGC et al.(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
January 26, 2009 Cases associated. (tm)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings. Judge Donald L. Graham no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/29/08 and by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/26/09. (tm)
January 9, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Airbus S.A.S., (tas)
December 11, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airbus S.A.S. Filing fee $ 350.00. Receipt#: 991836, filed by all Plaintiffs(jgn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tazoe et al v. Airbus S.A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Airbus S.A.S.
Represented By: Alvin F. Lindsay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giselle Garcia
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evandro Santos
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Mancia
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joice Helena Vinhales Oliveira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita De Cacia Flores Gomes
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christophe Alfred Haddad
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresinha Maria Stumpf
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Paula Nunes Marlon
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eni Terezinha Fleck De Paula Pessoa
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guilherme Ribeiro Martins Da Silva
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Feingold Pedreira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Simonetti Pereira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Silvia Volpi Scott
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry De Salles Canfield
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tereza Martins Costa Da Silveira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristiane Maria Loureiro Bueno
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luciana Haensel Mattia
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Claudete Soares Dornelles
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luiz De Almedia Dona
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Nobue Ogiyama Shiohara
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Dora Amoretty Souza
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Beatriz Rodrigu Pinto
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario Scott
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joao Carlos Warmling
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neusa Maria Garcia De Oliveira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Hartmann De Oliveira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iracema Piacentini Baruffaldi
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elza Da Silva Ferraz
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Victoria Da Fonseca
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra De Liz
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiana Casolari Servul Da Cunha
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Tazoe
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosely Aparecida Teixe Buzzanelli
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulo Calixto
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manoel Albuquerque De Paula Pessoa
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Italo Luiz Dalprat, Jr.
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archelau De Arruda Xavier
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Gunther Haddad
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaide Otilia Dos Santos
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Kodaira Goes
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto De Azevedo E Souza
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Barbosa Cassol
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabata Cassenote Mendonca
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosana Juan Girtler Weiss
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Pierucetti
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Luis Mateddi
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Souto Maior de Queiroz
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo De Barros Falcao Ferraz
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regiany Cristina Lulio
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alita Doroti Negretto
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleia Rosa Casagrande Salcedo
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirian Zeilman Drumm
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jarmin Alves
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena De Lima Braga Finzsch
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Carlos Dornelles
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonieta Pardal Coutinho De Moraes
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luiz Antonio De Carvalho Salcedo
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Kleinowski
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irenice Maria Da Cunha Souza
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Cestaro
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luiz Fernando Moyses
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regis De Mello
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Ellen Mohr
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneida Maria Fleck Suarez
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaro Luiz Cassepp De Carvalho
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ari Piestun
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Batista Kleinowski
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonis Antonio Simoes Cassol
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Rogerio Outor Teixeira
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Moller Filho
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Prouty
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Euler Barros Ferreira de Queiroz
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Masseran De Arruda Xavier
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Sasso Bilibio
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Goncalves Mendes Oguido
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thiago Soczeki de Paula
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Regina Palomino
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeoni Aparecida Soare Warmling
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luiz Carlos Sell
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Aparecida Soare Leite
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Klein Rocha
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Cele Da Costa Rocha Pinto Breguez
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zilma Otilia Dos Santos
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Joel Douglas Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Empresa Brasileira de Infra-Estrutura Aeroportuaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tam Linhas Aereas, S.A.
Represented By: Helaine S. Goodner
Represented By: Christopher Edson Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?