Segal et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Albert Segal and Marianna Chaparova
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv20718
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Marcia G. Cooke
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of USCA GRANTING Segal and Chaparova's motion to proceed in forma pauperis because they have established indigence and their petition is not frivolous. Segal and Chaparova have not shown a clear and indisputable right to mandamus relief, and their mandamus petition is DENIED. (amb)
March 8, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of filing Petition for Writ of Mandamus in the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal (vp)
February 10, 2011 Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southernhas been opened in United States District Court for the Western District of Washingtonas case 2:11-cv-00227, filed 02/07/2011 (vjk)
February 7, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:10-cv-20718 electronically transferred out to Washington Western. (dgj)
February 4, 2011 Case transferred to Western District of Washington electronically (tm)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/4/2011. (tm)
January 31, 2011 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to 43 MOTION to Compel filed by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (jcy)
January 25, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion to Attend Mediation by Phone by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (jcy)
January 21, 2011 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Compel filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Esau, David)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Defendant's Motion to Permit its Corporate Representative to Attend Mediation by Telephone. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/20/2011. (rss)
January 18, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Permit Amazon's Corporate Representative to Attend Mediation by Telephone by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Esau, David)
January 18, 2011 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to 43 MOTION to Compel filed by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (jcy)
January 18, 2011 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Appear for Deposition and Provide Contact Information for the Witnesses on their Witness List MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Esau, David)
January 6, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel by Albert Segal. Responses due by 1/24/2011 (jcy)
January 4, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re 40 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Appear for Deposition and Provide Contact Information for the Witnesses on their Witness List MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions Notice of Filing Documents in Support of Motions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Esau, David)
January 3, 2011 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Compel filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Esau, David)
December 22, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Appear for Deposition and Provide Contact Information for the Witnesses on their Witness List ( Responses due by 1/10/2011), MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Esau, David)
December 22, 2010 Filing 39 Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Albert Segal. Responses due by 1/10/2011 (jcy)
December 9, 2010 Filing 38 Letter/Notice of Mediation Hearing filed by Mediator- Melvin Rubin Mediation Hearing set for 2/15/2011 09:00 AM (lk)
November 24, 2010 Filing 37 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Amazon.com, Inc. re 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Esau, David)
November 18, 2010 Filing 36 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 33 Clerk's Appointment of Mediator, 34 ORDER Scheduling Mediation. US Mail returned for: return to sender unclaimed unable to forward. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided.US Mail returned for Marianna Chaparova. Second return/Attempt (rb)
November 17, 2010 Filing 35 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 33 Clerk's Appointment of Mediator, 34 ORDER Scheduling Mediation. US Mail returned for: return to sender unclazimed unable to forward. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided.US Mail returned for Albert Segal. First Return/Attempt (rb)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Melvin A. Rubin Mediation Hearing set for 2/15/2011 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/13/2010. (tm)
September 28, 2010 Filing 33 Clerk's Appointment of Mediator: Melvin A. Rubin added (pt)
September 27, 2010 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator(lh)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/20/2011 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 6/15/2011 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2010., Expert Discovery due by 2/18/2011., Fact Discovery due by 1/3/2011., Joinder of Parties due by 10/8/2010., Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2011., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/6/2011.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/4/2011.). Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2010. (im)
August 12, 2010 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Esau, David)
August 2, 2010 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (lh)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION ( Responses due by 8/2/2010); denying 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/23/2010. (tm)
July 16, 2010 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively, OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Responding by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (ls)
July 6, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss 22 Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or alternatively, MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Amazon.com, Inc.. Responses due by 7/23/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Catherine Ceely and Participation Agreement)(Esau, David)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 17 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/29/10. (tm)
June 23, 2010 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc. (Esau, David)
June 23, 2010 Filing 23 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Pretrial Deadlines, # 2 Exhibit B - Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Esau, David)
June 21, 2010 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., filed by Albert Segal, Marianna Chaparova.(lh)
June 11, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE/REPLY to 20 Memorandum of Law, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Esau, David)
June 1, 2010 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Improper Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Improper Venue or, alternatively, by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (tb)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot 18 Motion to exceed page limit. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/27/10. (tm)
May 26, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to exceed page limit in responding to defendant's motions re 17 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Improper Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Improper Venue or, alternatively, by Marianna Chaparova, Albert Segal. (tb)
May 17, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Improper Venue or, alternatively,, MOTION to Change Venue or, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amazon.com, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Catherine Ceely and Participation Agreement)(Esau, David)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint Amazon.com, Inc. response due 5/17/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 5/14/2010. (tb)
May 7, 2010 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esau, David)
April 20, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION, granting 11 Motion for Clarification; granting 11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/20/10. (tm)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 4/15/2010. (rg)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 4/15/2010. (rg)
April 14, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION for clarification 6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, and/or MOTION to Amend/Correct 6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Albert Segal. (lh)
April 13, 2010 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (dgj)
April 13, 2010 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (dgj)
March 10, 2010 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert Segal. (ebs)
March 10, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marianna Chaparova. (ebs)
March 10, 2010 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment on Electronic Case to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (ebs)
March 10, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT fo Civil Penalties, Damages, Injunctive and Other Equitable Relief against Amazon.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 350.00. IFP Filed, filed by Albert Segal, Marianna Chaparova. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ebs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segal et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianna Chaparova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?