Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv20271
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Ted E. Bandstra
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Scola
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2012 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re (97 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) MOTION to Change Venue filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci in Support)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying 108 Apple's Motion to Strike Portion of Motorola's Response to HTC's Motion to Transfer Venue. See the attached ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/9/2012. (jky)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 PAPERLESS ORDER regarding 107 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. The prior PAPERLESS ORDER 109 was meant to also include attorneys Christine Saunders Haskett and Samuel F. Ernst. The Clerk shall update the list of counsel to reflect the withdrawal of these attorneys as well. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/6/2012. (jky)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PAPERLESS ORDER regarding 107 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorneys Robert T. Haslam and Robert D. Fram of Covington & Burling LLP have withdrawn from the representation of Apple, Inc. in this matter. Apple has consented to the withdrawal and will continue to be represented by the other attorneys and law firms that have appeared in this case. Accordingly, the Clerk shall update the list of counsel to reflect the withdrawal of these attorneys. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/6/2012. (jky)
July 6, 2012 Attorney Robert T. Haslam; Robert D. Fram and Christine Saunders Haskett terminated per DE 109 and 110 . Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Robert Fram, Christine Haskett, Robert Haslam. (jua)
July 5, 2012 Filing 108 MOTION to Strike 103 Response/Reply (Other) by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 7/23/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
July 5, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Covington & Burling as Counsel of Record (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Pace, Christopher)
June 29, 2012 Filing 106 Clerks Notice to Filer re 103 Response/Reply (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#105]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 28, 2012 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Replies due by 7/9/2012. (ls)(See Image at DE # 103 )
June 28, 2012 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re 97 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lawrence Lien in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 6/29/2012 (ls).
June 28, 2012 Filing 103 RESPONSE/REPLY to 97 MOTION to Change Venue by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Kruse, Regan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 102 ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PAINTIFF APPLE'S INC'S COUNTERCLAIMS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Re: 95 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) Modified text on 6/26/2012 (bb).
June 25, 2012 Filing 101 ANSWER to Counterclaim and, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Kruse, Regan) Modified on 6/26/2012 (ls).
June 13, 2012 Filing 100 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Herrera, Sujey) Modified Text on 6/14/2012 (ls).
June 11, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc. re (98 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Affidavit in Support of Motion,, of Filing Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) Modified on 6/12/2012 (ls).
June 9, 2012 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 97 MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Rebekah L. Punak filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Carey, John)
June 9, 2012 Filing 97 MOTION to Change Venue by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Responses due by 6/28/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Stephanie Bariault, # 3 Declaration of Jamie L. Benson)(Carey, John)
June 8, 2012 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re (83 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) MOTION to Sever filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raymond Pao, # 2 Declaration of Rebekah L. Punak)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John)
June 4, 2012 Filing 95 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Apple Inc..Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Pace, Christopher)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PAPERLESS ORDER on 92 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 14, 2012 Order, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. This Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/30/2012. (jky)
May 29, 2012 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Sever filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael T. Pieja in Support of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Sever, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 5/30/2012 (ls).
May 29, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Reconsideration re 84 Scheduling Order,,, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Kruse, Regan)
May 29, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION to Adopt/Join 83 MOTION to Sever by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Kruse, Regan)
May 17, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 89 Amended Complaint of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Kruse, Regan) Modified Text on 5/18/2012 (ls).
May 16, 2012 Filing 89 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Kruse, Regan)
May 16, 2012 Filing 88 Clerks Notice to Filer re 85 Response/Reply (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#87]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
May 15, 2012 Filing 87 ANSWER and Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc..(ls)(See Image at DE # 85 )
May 15, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Regan Noelle Kruse on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Kruse, Regan)
May 15, 2012 Filing 85 RESPONSE/REPLY , ANSWER, and COUNTERCLAIMS to Apple Inc.'s 2nd Amended Answer and Counterclaims [DE 332 filed in 10-cv-23580-RNS] by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Kruse, Regan)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER Consolidating Cases; Order granting 64 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint: ( Trial set for 4/21/2014 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr, Calendar Call set for 4/15/2014 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr, First Amended Complaint due by 5/16/2012, Expert Discovery due by 10/4/2013, Fact Discovery due by 7/5/2013, Dispositive Motions Deadline 11/1/2013, First Mediation Deadline 5/31/2013, In Limine Motions due by 1/31/2014, Pretrial Motions due by 1/31/2014, Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/24/2014, First Joint Interim Status Report due by 3/1/2013). The 2010 and 2012 cases are CONSOLIDATED. All filings going forward in these cases shall be made under the 2012 Case Number. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/14/2012. (See Order for Further Deadline Details). (ar2)
May 14, 2012 Set Hearing per DE 84 Order. Markman Hearing set for 4/26/2013 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. (ar2) Modified text on 5/14/2012 (ar2).
May 11, 2012 Filing 83 MOTION to Sever by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Responses due by 5/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mohammed Versi, # 2 Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci)(Carey, John)
May 11, 2012 Filing 82 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Carey, John)
May 11, 2012 Filing 81 Clerks Notice to Filer re 78 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#80]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
May 10, 2012 Filing 80 JOINT STATUS REPORT regarding Amended Procedural Schedule by Apple Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., One & Company Design, Inc. (ls)(See Image at DE # 78 )
May 10, 2012 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew Korhonen, # 2 Exhibit A to Matthew Korhonen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Matthew Korhonen Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Matthew Korhonen Declaration)(Herrera, Sujey)
May 10, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE by Apple Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., One & Company Design, Inc. Joint Status Report Regarding Amended Procedural Schedule (Pace, Christopher)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 76 Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline. The deadline for the parties to submit a Joint Interim Status Report is temporarily stayed. When the parties submit a proposed amended procedural schedule, they shall suggest a new deadline for the Joint Interim Status Report to be filed. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/9/2012. (jky)
May 9, 2012 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 25 Scheduling Order,, Suspend the Requirement of Submission of a Joint Interim Status Report until Pleading Issues are Resolved by the Court by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrera, Sujey) Modified Text on 5/10/2012 (ls).
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 74 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The HTC Defendants are given until 5/16/2012 to submit a response to Apple's Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/4/2012. (jky)
May 3, 2012 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carey, John)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 71 72 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Matthew Korhonan and Graham Pechenik may appear as pro hac vice counsel in this matter on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. The Clerk is directed to provide notification of all electronic filings to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in their respective Motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/3/2012. (jky)
May 3, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Graham Pechenik. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 38042. (ksa)
May 3, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew Korhonen. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 38041. (ksa)
April 30, 2012 Filing 70 RESPONSE/REPLY to 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Anne Cappella)(Pace, Christopher)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 67 68 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Monica Mucchetti Eno and Stefani C. Smith are given permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Apple, Inc. in this action. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of all electronic filings to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in their respective Motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/30/2012. (jky)
April 30, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stefani C. Smith. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 37867. (ksa)
April 30, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Monica Mucchetti Eno. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 37865. (ksa)
April 17, 2012 Filing 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 5/4/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 4/18/2012 (ls).
April 16, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint of Correction (Herrera, Sujey) Modified on 4/17/2012 (ls).
April 13, 2012 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(Herrera, Sujey) Modified on 4/16/2012 (ls).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 59 60 61 62 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Rebekah L. Puna, Simona Agnolucci, Brian L. Ferrall, and Leo L. Lam are given permission to appear as pro hac vice counsel on behalf of the Counterclaim Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of all electronic filings to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in their respective Motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/13/2012. (jky)
April 10, 2012 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Leo L. Lam. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 36715. (ksa)
April 10, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Simona Agnolucci. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 36714. (ksa)
April 10, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian L. Ferrall. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 36713. (ksa)
April 10, 2012 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rebekah L. Punak. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 36712. (ksa)
April 9, 2012 Filing 58 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Apple (DE 27) by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Herrera, Sujey)
April 9, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 27 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, NOTICE OF FILING SUMMONS (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) One & Company Design, Inc., # 2 Summon(s) One and Company Design, Inc., # 3 Summon(s) HTC Corporation)(Pace, Christopher)
April 4, 2012 Reset Answer Due Deadline per 56 Order: HTC America Innovation Inc. response due 5/11/2012; HTC America, Inc. response due 5/11/2012; One & Company Design, Inc. response due 5/11/2012. (asl)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 55 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. HTC America, Inc., One & Company Design, Inc. and HTC AmericaInnovation Inc. are given until May 11, 2012 to respond to the counterclaim by Apple. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/2/2012. (jky)
March 30, 2012 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim re 27 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by HTC America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carey, John)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 53 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Motorola is given until April 9, 2012 to file an answer to the counterclaims filed by Apple. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/30/2012. (jky)
March 30, 2012 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 27 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer Counterclaims)(Herrera, Sujey)
March 29, 2012 Filing 52 Clerks Notice to Filer re 48 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#51]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Azra Hadzemehmedovic is given permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Apple, Inc. in this matter. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of all electronic filings in this case to the attorney at the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/29/2012. (jky)
March 28, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address/Name by Jill J. Ho (ls)(See Image at DE # 48 )
March 28, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Attorney Name Change (Pace, Christopher)
March 27, 2012 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Azra Hadzemehmedovic. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35966. (ksa)
March 26, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Filing of Summons on HTC America Innovation, Inc and HTC America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) HTC America Innovation, Inc and HTC America, Inc)(Pace, Christopher)
March 26, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Striking 37 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Apple Inc. by Apple Inc. (Pace, Christopher)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert D. Fram is given permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Apple, Inc. The Clerk is directed to provide electronic notification of all filings to this attorney at the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/26/2012. (jky)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 39 40 41 42 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Christine Saunders Haskett, Michael T. Pieja, Kenneth H. Bridges, and Mark G. Davis are given permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Apple, Inc. The Clerk is directed to provide electronic notification of all filings to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in their Motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/26/2012. (jky)
March 23, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert D. Fram. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35856. (ksa)
March 23, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark G. Davis. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35855. (ksa)
March 23, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth H. Bridges. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35857. (ksa)
March 23, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael T. Pieja. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35858. (ksa)
March 23, 2012 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christine Saunders Haskett. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35859. (ksa)
March 23, 2012 Filing 38 Clerks Notice to Filer re 37 Summons Returned Executed,. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls)
March 22, 2012 Filing 37 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Apple Inc.. HTC America Innovation Inc. served on 3/19/2012, answer due 4/2/2012; HTC America, Inc. served on 3/19/2012, answer due 4/2/2012. (Pace, Christopher)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 30 31 32 33 34 35 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Matthew D. Powers, Anne M. Cappella, Jill J. Ho, Robert T. Haslam, Steven S. Cherensky, and Paul T. Erlich are given permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Apple, Inc. in this matter. The Clerk is directed to provide notification of all electronic filings in this case to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/22/2012. (jky)
March 20, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul T. Ehrlich. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35628. (ksa)
March 20, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven S. Cherensky. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35627. (ksa)
March 20, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert T. Haslam. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35623. (ksa)
March 20, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jill J. Ho. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35624. (ksa)
March 20, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anne M. Cappella. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35625. (ksa)
March 20, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew D. Powers. Filing Fee $ 75.00. (ksa)
March 15, 2012 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (cqs)
March 15, 2012 Filing 28 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., One & Company Design, Inc. and HTC America Innovation Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
March 12, 2012 Filing 27 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 3/13/2012 (ls).
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/5/2012. (jua)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 1/28/2013 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Calendar Call set for 1/22/2013 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2012. Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2012. Fact Discovery due by 6/8/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 4/13/2012. Mediation Deadline 8/27/2012. In Limine Motions due by 10/29/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/2012. Pretrial and Daubert Motions due by 10/29/2012. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/11/2013. Joint Interim Status Report due by 5/11/2012. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/5/2012. (See order for more deadline details) (jua) (Main Document 25 replaced on 3/6/2012) (jh).
March 2, 2012 Filing 24 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Apple Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Escobar, Annette)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until March 2, 2012 to submit a proposed case schedule with pertinent deadlines and a proposed trial date, as previously directed by the Court in its 21 Order Regarding Scheduling Matters and Referral of Discovery to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/27/2012. (jky)
February 24, 2012 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Case Schedule re 21 Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 3/12/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escobar, Annette) Modified on 2/27/2012 (ls).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Scheduling Matters and Referral of Discovery to the Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge Ted Bandstra for discovery motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/15/2012. (asl)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of Clarification Regarding Transfer 17 . Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/15/2012. (jky) Modified linkage on 2/16/2012 (wc).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Raymond N. Nimrod is permitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Motorola Mobility, lnc. The Clerk shall provide notices of electronic filing to this attorney at the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/15/2012. (jky)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra (Discovery matters) for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 2/15/2012. Judge K. Michael Moore, Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/14/2012 and Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/15/2012. (jky) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/15/2012) (jh).
February 14, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Raymond N. Nimrod. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 33665. (ksa)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiffs Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings 15 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 15 is GRANTED. David Nelson may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to davenelseon@quinnemanuel.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/8/2012. (dwe)
February 2, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Nelson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 32958. (ksa)
January 31, 2012 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Apple Inc. waiver sent on 1/31/2012, answer due 4/2/2012. (Mullins, Edward)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 THIS CAUSE came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings 9 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 9 is GRANTED. David A. Perlson may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/30/2012. (dwe)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 THIS CAUSE came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings 8 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 8 is GRANTED. Marshall M. Searcy, III, may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to marshallsearcy@quinnemanuel.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/30/2012. (dwe)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE EDWIN G. TORRES. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/30/2012. (rg1)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 120 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of or a description by category and location of all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and / or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.M. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/30/2012. (rg1)
January 27, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Perlson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 32680. (ksa)
January 27, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Marshall M. Searcy. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 32681. (ksa)
January 27, 2012 Filing 7 Order Transferring Case Pursuant to Administrative Order 2011-53. This matter is hereby reassigned to the calendar of United States District Judge K. Michael Moore for all further proceedings, Judge William J. Zloch no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/25/2012. (mb)
January 25, 2012 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Lucas, Hal)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Lucas, Hal)
January 25, 2012 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ots)
January 25, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ots)
January 24, 2012 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge William J. Zloch and Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum (ots)
January 24, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4398912, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Mullins, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: Raymond N. Nimrod
Represented By: David A. Perlson
Represented By: Marshall M. Searcy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?